Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03390
Date Filed2019-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning communications to or from Andrew Lawler, the agency's deputy assistant secretary for international fisheries, to third parties. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-081COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6529750) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Summons AG summons, # 3 Summons Agency Summons, # 4 Summons USAO summons, # 5 Declaration 26.1 statement)(Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-12-094NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-105Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar