Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLandis v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityRockford
Case Number3:2019cv50290
Date Filed2019-11-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Philip G. Reinhard
PlaintiffCarlton Theodore Landis
Case DescriptionCarleton Landis, a federal prisoner submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning employees of the Bureau of Prisons. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Landis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Prisons
DefendantOffice Of Personnel Management
DefendantBureau of Alcohol Tobacco and Firemarms and Explosives
DefendantExecutive Office of United States Attorneys
Service List
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-041RECEIVED COMPLAINT by Carlton Theodore Landis; (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (jp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-042PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-043APPLICATION by Plaintiff Carlton Theodore Landis for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (jp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-12-034ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 10, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/3/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar