Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleElectronic Frontier Foundation v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv07431
Date Filed2019-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffElectronic Frontier Foundation
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Frontier Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the use of Rapid DNA testing to detect family fraud. EFF submitted two of its requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. EFF also requested expediting processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged both requests. It denied both requests because they were too broad to conduct a search. EFF filed administrative appeals of both denials. EFF also sent a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. EFF also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It granted EFF's request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, EFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-121COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13879021.). Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hussain, Saira) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-122Proposed Summons. (Hussain, Saira) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-123Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Hussain, Saira) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-124NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Lynch (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-125NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Thomas Rumold (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-126Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-157Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-158Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-259SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Hussain, Saira) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-2610CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Hussain, Saira) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-2611CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Homeland Security.. (Hsu, Shining) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar