Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03433
Date Filed2019-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Census Bureau for records concerning hiring of non-citizens as translator or any other role to obtain an accurate count of immigrant community populations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Judicial Watch to clarify its request by identifying names of offices and/or individuals to search. After several back-and-forth discussions about the scope of the request without any further action on the part of the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
1401 Constitution Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20230
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562761) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Commerce)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-15Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-153STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/15/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 11/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar