Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03438
Date Filed2019-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffSOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
PlaintiffAL OTRO LADO, INC
Case DescriptionThe Southern Poverty Law Center and Al Otro Lado submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning detention of unaccompanied minor children at or near ports of entry and the subsequent treatment of those children. SPLC and Al Otro Lado's also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agencies told SPLC and Al Otro Lado's that no fees would be incurred in processing their requests. However, after hearing anything further from either agency, SPLC and Al Otro Lado's filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
2255
U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-141COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6563859) filed by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - FINAL FOIA Request from AOL, SPLC to CBP - May 31, 2019, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Acknowledgement Letter, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - FOIA Fee Waiver Disposition Reached for CBP-2019-056793, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Narrow the Scope Letter, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Response to Narrow the Scope letter re FOIA request CBP-2019-056793 part 7 - June 25 2019, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Summons for US CBP, # 8 Summons Summons for US DHS, # 9 Summons Summons for US Attorney DC, # 10 Summons Summons for US Attorney General)(Bergin, John) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Al Otro Lado, Inc., SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Bergin, John) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-15Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-153SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-184MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jon Michaelson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6569370. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration ISO Motion PHV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-185MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mansi H. Shah, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6569542. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Mansi H. Shah ISO Motion PHV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-196MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sara J. Bradford, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6573052. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Sara J. Bradford ISO Motion PHV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar