Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZYNOVIEVA v. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03445
Date Filed2019-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffOLENA ZYNOVIEVA
Case DescriptionOlena Zynovieva submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning herself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Zynovieva's counsel contacted the agency to check on the status of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Zynovieva filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Defendant2255
US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C St NW
Washington, DC 20520
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-151COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6566071) filed by OLENA ZYNOVIEVA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Hampe, Carl) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-18Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-193STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/19/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-194NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Pierce on behalf of OLENA ZYNOVIEVA (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-225NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of US DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/22/2019. (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/22/2019. (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/22/2019 (Pierce, Daniel) Modified to correct party served from plaintiff to Department of State on 11/25/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar