Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMABEE v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03448
Date Filed2019-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffMICHAEL MABEE
Case DescriptionMichael Mabee submitted three FOIA requests to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning notices of penalty submitted by the North American Electric Reliability Corporation to FERC. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked Mabee to clarify portions of his requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Mabee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-151COMPLAINT 19-cv-3448 against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6566613) filed by MICHAEL MABEE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-18Case assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-12-033GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/3/2019. (jag) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar