Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03422
Date Filed2019-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffROGER CHARLES DAY, JR.
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-12Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/12/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-121COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE with Jury Demand filed by ROGER CHARLES DAY. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-122MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROGER CHARLES DAY (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-123PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ROGER CHARLES DAY (adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-126SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-11-274ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $243.21 from Prison Account of ROGER CHARLES DAY and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-04Case Reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-045NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ROGER CHARLES DAY, JR. Case related to Case No. 17-1418. (zmd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar