Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03477
Date Filed2019-11-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning various entities, including two Russian nationals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and assigned a tracking number to search for records concerning Lavabit. The FBI then told Eddington that his request was too vague to conduct a search. Eddington filed an administrative appeal, asking for expedited processing. The agency denied Eddington's request for expedited processing for his appeal and later denied the appeal entirely. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-181COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6571653) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-182NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-19Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-203SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar