Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReid v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv10705
Date Filed2019-11-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffEverod Reid
Case DescriptionEverod Reid, a lawful permanent resident, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning his Alien file. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Reid filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantDepartment Of Homeland Security
DefendantExecutive Office For Immigration Review
DefendantDepartment Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-191COMPLAINT against Department Of Homeland Security, Department Of Justice, Executive Office For Immigration Review, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18095250)Document filed by Everod Reid. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D)(Lauterback, Molly) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lauterback, Molly) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-193STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-08393. Document filed by Everod Reid.(Lauterback, Molly) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-194FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pc). (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-195FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pc). (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-196FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pc). (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-197FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pc). (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-198FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorneys Office - SDNY, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Lauterback, Molly) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pc). (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-20***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Molly Lauterback. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Molly Lauterback. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Kings;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Molly Lauterback to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 8 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the FIOA summons form not the 1855 summons form. Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 19cv8393. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-209NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooke Menschel on behalf of Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2010REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2011REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2012REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2013REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2014REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2015FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) Modified on 11/21/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-21CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19cv8393 and declined by Judge Katherine Polk Failla and returned to wheel for assignment. (ad) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (ad) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2116ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Homeland Security. (dnh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2117ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (dnh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2118ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Executive Office For Immigration Review. (dnh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2119ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (dnh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2120ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (dnh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brooke Menschel to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Only one summons request per event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2521REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Everod Reid. (Menschel, Brooke) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-2622ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (dnh) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-12-0423NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of Department Of Homeland Security, Department Of Justice, Executive Office For Immigration Review, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar