Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03485
Date Filed2019-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications or meetings between John Solomon and a list of officials at the agency. DFF also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted DFF's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6576985) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons to Department of State, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons to Attorney General, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-202NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. Case related to Case No. 1:19-cv-2934. (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/3/2019 to reflect signature on US Attorney's summons) (zmc). (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-12-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/25/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-02Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-035Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar