Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03490
Date Filed2019-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Park Service for records concerning funding for the trapping, removal, or relocation of burros from the Mohave National Reserve, Death Valley National Park, and from the vicinity around Aja, Arizona, or the Mexican border. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WHFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-201COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6579349) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-202REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-21Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-274STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/27/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar