Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03535
Date Filed2019-11-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffNATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the National Marine Fisheries Service for records related to the reinitiated Endangered Species Act Section 7 consultation on the Coordinated Long-term Operation of the Central Valley Project and State Water Project and endangered winter-run Chinnook salmon and threatened spring-run Chinnook salmon. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told NRDC that it would provide an interim response. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-221COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6589082) filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Hammer, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-25Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-252REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected Summons re 1 Complaint, filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL.(Hammer, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-263SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-264MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barbara J. Chisholm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6595595. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-265MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth Vissers, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6595674. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-266MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Drevet J. Hunt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6595682. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-26MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Drevet J. Hunt is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 26, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-26MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Elizabeth Vissers is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 26, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-26MINUTE ORDER denying 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), an attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court must submit a declaration that sets forth: "(1) the full name of the attorney; (2) the attorney's office address and telephone number; (3) a list of all bars to which the attorney has been admitted; (4) a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline; (5) the number of times the attorney has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court within the last two years; and (6) whether the attorney, if the attorney engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia, is a member of the District of Columbia Bar or has an application for membership pending." The declaration in support of 4 does not fully comply with element (5) of this rule because it does not list the number of times the applicant has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court within the last two years. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 26, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-277MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barbara J. Chisholm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6600873. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Barbara J. Chisholm in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-27MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Barbara J. Chisholm is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 27, 2019. ( lcrc3) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-12-028NOTICE of Appearance by Drevet John Hunt on behalf of NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Hunt, Drevet) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-039NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Vissers on behalf of NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Vissers, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-0410NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J. Chisholm on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chisholm, Barbara) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar