Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNBCUniversal Media, LLC et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv00280
Date Filed2020-01-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Denise L. Cote
PlaintiffNBCUniversal Media, LLC
PlaintiffHannah Rappleye
Case DescriptionNBC reporter Hannah Rappleye submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning detainees who died in the custody of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement during 2018 and 2019. In response to her 2018 request, ICE told Rappleye that a list of detainees who died in ICE custody was available on the agency's website. Rappleye filed an administrative appeal of that decision, arguing that the data elements available on the website were far less than publicly available in prior years. In response to her 2019 request, ICE told Rappleye that the information was exempt under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). Rappleye filed an administrative appeal of that decision as well. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Rappleye filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [12]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-131COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Hannah Rappleye.(Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-132CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-133FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Hannah Rappleye. (Bierbauer, Erik) Modified on 1/14/2020 (gp). (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-134RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC.(Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-14CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . (gp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-14Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (gp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-14Case Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-14***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Erik Bierbauer to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'As to' docket entry text was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-165REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Hannah Rappleye. (Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-176ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-247AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC; Hannah Rappleye. (Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-02-038NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/31/2020) (gr) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-209CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Charles S. Jacob dated February 20, 2020. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Jacob, Charles) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-2110ORDER granting 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 9, 2020. (U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 3/9/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/20/20) (yv) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-0911ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Jacob, Charles) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-2012ORDER: This action was filed on January 13, 2020. On February 3, an initial conference was scheduled to occur on April 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference is scheduled for April 3 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the telephone conference: Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/2020) (rj) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar