Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00110
Date Filed2020-01-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJournalist Jimmy Tobias submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning communications to or from certain agency officials as well as records from U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement about public protests in New York City. The agency acknowledged receipt of Tobias' requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of his requests Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6735693) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Civil Cover Sheet, # 18 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-152NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-16Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-213SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-224STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-02-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/27/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 1/27/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/29/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-289ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-03MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 3, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-1710Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-18MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 17, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 18, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-3011Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Michelle D. Jackson; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order; (eg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 16, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 20, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-05-1813NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michelle D. Jackson (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-06-1614Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 16, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-07-1615Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 16, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 16, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/16/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-09-1616Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 13, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 16, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/13/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-11-1317Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 12, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 16, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2021-01-1218Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 12, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 12, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-03-1219Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 11, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 12, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-05-1120Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-05-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 9, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 11, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-06-2921NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-07-0922Joint STATUS REPORT by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 7, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 9, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar