Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCANO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00324
Date Filed2020-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffLUIS H. CANO
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-31Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/31/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-01-311COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by LUIS H. CANO. (zmd) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-01-312MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LUIS H. CANO (zmd) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-01-313PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by LUIS H. CANO (zmd) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-03-054ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $100.04 from Prison Account of LUIS H. CANO and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/04/2020. (zmc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-09Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-097SUMMONS (4) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 3/12/2020 (ztd) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/16/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/15/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/12/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/12/2020 (ztd); (See docket entry no. 5 to view.) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-238NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar