Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOX v. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY AND TAX INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR TAX ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00631
Date Filed2020-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJANIS L. COX
Case DescriptionJanis Cox submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Treasury, the Tax Inspector General for Tax Administration, and the IRS for records concerning whether she was subject to tax laws. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies Cox filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TREASURY AND TAX INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR TAX ADMINISTRATION
also known as TIGTA
DefendantJ. RUSSELL GEORGE
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE COMMISSIONER
DefendantSTEVEN MILLER White House Chief of Staff Liaison
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-03Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/3/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY AND TAX INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR TAX ADMINISTRATION, J. RUSSELL GEORGE, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE COMMISSIONER, STEVEN MILLER filed by JANIS L. COX.(zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-032MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JANIS L. COX (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-113ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by JANIS L. COX. ORDERED that within 20 days of entry of this order, the plaintiff either shall provide a full residence address, or shall file a motion to use a post office box as the mailing address. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/11/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-264MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box by JANIS L. COX (adh, ) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar