Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTINEZ v. U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01006
Date Filed2020-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFREDDY MARTINEZ
Case DescriptionFreddy Martinez, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning agency staff participation in an Anti-Defamation League National Counter-Terrorism Seminar in Israel. Six months after he submitted the request, the agency told Martinez that it could not find his request. Two months after that, the agency finally acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency Martinez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7033609) filed by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-172NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-173NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-174SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-05-295NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-296ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE.(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-29MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before June 26, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 29, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/29/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served on 4/29/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/29/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-1810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/29/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/29/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-2611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 28, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 26, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-08-2812Joint STATUS REPORT by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 12 Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 4, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/4/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-0413Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 15, 2020. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 4, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/15/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-10-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 16, 2020. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 16, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/16/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-11-1615Joint STATUS REPORT by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 16, 2020. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 17, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/16/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-12-1616Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 18, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 17, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/18/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2021-01-1917Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 19, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 20, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/19/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-02-1918Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before April 19, 2021. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 19, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar