Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleImmigrant Defense Project v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv10660
Date Filed2020-12-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Crotty
PlaintiffImmigrant Defense Project
PlaintiffNew Sanctuary Coalition
Case DescriptionThe Immigrant Defense Project and the New Sanctuary Coalition submitted a FOIA request to U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's policies and protocols pertaining to the supervision and monitoring of immigrants pursuant to Orders of Supervision and so-called alternatives to detention. IDP and NSC also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted IDP and NSC a fee waiver but did not address their requests for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further the agency, IDP and NSC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-171COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23084752)Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project, New Sanctuary Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Long-Form FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Short-Form FOIA, # 3 Exhibit FOIA Request Receipt No. 2020-ICFO-16964, # 4 Exhibit FOIA Request Receipt No. 2020-ICFO-16973, # 5 Exhibit Long-Form FOIA Administrative Appeal [No. 2020-ICFO-16964], # 6 Exhibit Short-Form FOIA Administrative Appeal [No. 2020-ICFO-16973]).(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-172RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project, New Sanctuary Coalition..(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-173CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-174REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project, New Sanctuary Coalition..(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-18***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Louise Rofe. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Immigrant Defense Project, New Sanctuary Coalition,United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-18CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(dnh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-18Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (dnh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-18Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-185ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(dnh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-286NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2021-01-087AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project; New Sanctuary Coalition..(Rofe, Jessica) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-198CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Talia Kraemer dated 1/19/2021. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar