Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00624
Date Filed2021-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, the Department of Justice, and the Secret Service for records concerning communications received by various officials pertaining to the attack on the U.S. Capitol Building on Jan. 6. American Oversight also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantNATIONAL GUARD BUREAU
DefendantU.S. ARMY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-091COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8289210) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-103SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-114STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/11/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-215NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 03/21/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar