Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00626
Date Filed2021-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the Unclassified Expenditure Report for Emergencies in the Diplomatic and Service Appropriation, known as the K Fund. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told CREW the request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8290138) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons State Dept, # 5 Summons State Dept OIG)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-10Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-103SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/12/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 3/12/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/21. (Sus, Nikhel); Modified text for date of service on 3/23/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-04-015GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar