Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMaritime Documentation Center Corp. v. United States Coast Guard
DistrictCentral District of California
CityEastern Division - Riverside
Case Number5:2021cv00489
Date Filed2021-03-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John W. Holcomb
PlaintiffMaritime Documentation Center Corp. a Montana corporation
Case DescriptionThe Maritime Documentation Corp., which did vessel documentation, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Coast Guard for records concerning the names and addresses of commercial and recreational vessel owners, which until 2017 had published the data in Merchant Vessels of the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but withheld identifying information about recreational vessels under Exemption 6 (invasion o privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Maritime Documentation filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. Maritime Documentation then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Coast Guard
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-191COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30954328 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - 2020-04-13 FOIA Request for PII, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - USCG Merchant Vessels of the United States, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - FAQ VESSELS, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D- 2020-06-23 FOIA Final Response, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - 2020-07-06 FOIA appeal, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F- NOAA Fisheries Vessel Documentation Data Caveats, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G - Check Status of Request, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H - USCG VESSELS, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I - 2020-CGAP-00024 Appeal Response, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT J - gao-21-100, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT K - National Vessel Documentation Center, # 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT L - Vessel Renewal Notice, # 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT M - Walk-in Customer Service, # 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT N - All Members Alphabetical List, # 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT O - Top 100 Dealers _ Boating Industry, # 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT P - NOAA Searchable Query Database, # 17 Exhibit EXHIBIT Q - National Vessel Documentation Center - FAQ) (Attorney David N Makous added to party Maritime Documentation Center Corp.(pty:bkmov))(Makous, David) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Maritime Documentation Center Corp.. (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-193CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp., (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-224NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-225NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-236Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, 1 filed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp.. (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-237Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, 1 filed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp.. (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-238Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, 1 filed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp.. (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-23921 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Coast Guard - Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of Justice. (lom) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-2310NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued 9 . Incorrect selection of 21 DAY Summons. (lom) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-231160 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Coast Guard. (lom) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-241260 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Coast Guard - Attorney General Merrick B. Garland. (lom) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-241360 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Coast Guard - Civil Process Clerk. (lom) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-2614STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-3115PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp., upon Plaintiff United States Coast Guard served on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Front Desk Reception. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Front Desk Reception. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-3116PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maritime Documentation Center Corp., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Left with Individual. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Left with Individual. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Makous, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-1417STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Coast Guard answer now due 5/22/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Coast Guard.(Attorney Ryan Casey Chapman added to party United States Coast Guard(pty:dft))(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar