Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlferez v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityTucson Division
Case Number4:2021cv00318
Date Filed2021-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Raner C Collins
PlaintiffMarco Antonio Alferez
Case DescriptionMarco Alferez submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Alferez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement named as (ICE) Immigration & Customs Enforcement at U.S. Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-091COMPLAINT filed by Marco Antonio Alferez. (10 pages) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope)(JAM) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-092NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (JAM) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-113ORDERED: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 8/11/2021. (MCO) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-254Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number TUC033413. PAID IN FULL. (SCA) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-09-095ORDER (Service Packet): Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement must answer the Complaint (Doc. 1 ).The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1 ), this Order, and summons forms for Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement and the United States. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The Clerk of Court will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. Upon receipt of the service packet, the Clerk of Court must send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Complaint, and this Order to (1) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona; (2) the Attorney General of the United States; and (3) Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement, pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 09/09/2021. (See attached Order for complete information.)(SCA) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar