Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHeavey v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictWestern District of New York
CityBuffalo
Case Number1:2021cv00906
Date Filed2021-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. William M. Skretny
PlaintiffMonica L. Heavey
Case DescriptionMonica Heavey submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning herself. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and told Heavey that it located no responsive records. Heavy filed an administrative appeal of the no records response. The FBI denied Heavey's administrative appeal and she filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-101COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice $ 402 receipt number 0209-4328450, filed by Monica L. Heavey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kuzma, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-11Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-11AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution .(TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-11Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms . (TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-112Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice. (TMK) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-273AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dayonna Johnson, U.S. Department of Justice, on August 13, 2021, filed by Monica L. Heavey. (Kuzma, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-09-094ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Smith, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-135TEXT REFERRAL ORDER. Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 9/13/2021. (JCM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-146TEXT ORDER. The parties are hereby directed to jointly complete and email to chambers at roemer@nywd.uscourts.gov, the attached case management order. Such shall be completed within 30 days of the date of this Text Order. The Court will issue a final case management order upon receipt and review of the proposed deadlines. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/14/2021. (RAZ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar