Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEsrati v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityDayton
Case Number3:2021cv00218
Date Filed2021-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael J. Newman
PlaintiffDavid Esrati
Case DescriptionDavid Estrati submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning for a presentation before the grand jury investigating him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Estrati filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice Southern District of Ohio
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigations
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-101COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice, filed by David Esrati. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-102Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney (pb) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-113SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Attorney Department of Justice served on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. Plaintiff insist the service is adequate via residential service by placing service under the door of the U.S. Attorney's Office, 200 W. Second Street, Room 602, Dayton, Ohio 45402 (pb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-135Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 300DAY025247 (pb) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-166RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 3:19-cv-251 are NOT related. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/16/21. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-277SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice. Federal Bureau of Investigations served on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; U.S. Department of Justice served on 8/19/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (pb) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-09-018NOTICE - 1. Parties are not permitted to have ex-parte communications with the Court. This means that you cannot communicate with the Court about the merits of your case, orally or in writing, without the other partys participation. 2. You must tell the Court and the other partys attorney, in writing, of changes to your address and/or telephone number. 3. Because pro se litigants do not have access to the Courts electronic filing system, they are required to mail a copy of anything they file with the Court to the other party's attorney and enclose a signed Certificate of Service. This requirement can be avoided if: (1) the pro se litigant personally brings the filing to the Clerk of Courts office for filing; (2) the attorney(s) for the other party agree to receive service solely through the Court's CM/ECF filing system; and (3) the Certificate of Service in the pro se litigants filing states that service will be made solely through the Courts CM/ECF filing system and counsel for the opposing party has so consented. 4. Pro se litigants are encouraged to read the Court's Guide for Pro Se Civil Litigants, which can be found at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/pro-sehandbook. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/31/21. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-149MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/11/2021. by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice. (Horwitz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1410RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/11/2021. filed by Plaintiff David Esrati. (pb) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1511MOTION request to E-file by Plaintiff David Esrati. (pb) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-1612REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/11/2021. filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice. (Horwitz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-17NOTATION ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Plead. Defendants shall answer, move, or plead in response to Plaintiff Complaint (Doc. # 1 ) by 10/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 9/17/2021. (lk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants' answer due 10/11/2021. (lk) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-17NOTATION ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Request to E-file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 9/17/2021. (lk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar