Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-01-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681065564), filed by Brady Eames. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (eat) (Entered: 01/28/2015) |
2015-01-29 | 2 | ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document.. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/30/2015. (reb) (Entered: 01/29/2015) |
2015-02-23 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(jlw) (Entered: 02/25/2015) |
2015-03-05 | 4 | RESPONSE to Motion re 3 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The(pty:dft), Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party National Archives and Records Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party Office of the Federal Register, The(pty:dft)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 03/05/2015) |
2015-03-05 | 5 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 4 Response to Motion,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 03/05/2015) |
2015-03-09 | 6 | ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Federal Defendants shall file a response to Mr Eames' amended complaint within 60 days after this Court's order authorizing the amended complaint's filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/9/15. (jlw) (Entered: 03/09/2015) |
2015-05-29 | 7 | MOTION to Speed Up Serving an Order filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(jlw) (Entered: 06/02/2015) |
2015-06-25 | 8 | ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to File; denying 7 Motion to Speed up Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/25/15. (jlw) (Entered: 06/25/2015) |
2015-07-13 | 9 | Correspondence from Brady Eames (jlw) (Entered: 07/16/2015) |
2015-07-13 | 10 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, filed by Brady Eames. (jlw) (Entered: 07/16/2015) |
2015-07-13 | 11 | MOTION to Compel Defendants to Prove their Receipt of Plaintiff's Papers filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(jlw) (Entered: 07/16/2015) |
2015-07-17 | 12 | MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Prove their Receipt of Plaintiff's Papers filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 07/17/2015) |
2015-07-31 | 13 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Prove their Receipt of Plaintiff's Papers filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (jlw) (Entered: 08/03/2015) |
2015-08-19 | 14 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 08/19/2015) |
2015-08-21 | 15 | RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (jlw) (Entered: 08/25/2015) |
2015-08-21 | 16 | MOTION to Serve Supplemental Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. (jlw) Modified by removing term date on 6/24/2016 (blh). (Entered: 08/25/2015) |
2015-09-01 | 17 | ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 10 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The answer due 9/30/2015; National Archives and Records Administration answer due 9/30/2015; Office of the Federal Register, The answer due 9/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/1/15. (jlw) (Entered: 09/01/2015) |
2015-09-30 | 18 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Joseph Scanlon) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. (Bennett, Jared) Modified by removing term date on 6/24/2016 (blh). (Entered: 09/30/2015) |
2015-10-01 | 19 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying 11 . Motion to compel defendants to prove receipt of papers from plaintiff is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/1/15. No attached document. (dla) (Entered: 10/01/2015) |
2015-11-02 | 20 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(jlw) (Entered: 11/04/2015) |
2015-11-04 | 21 | RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 11/04/2015) |
2015-11-05 | 22 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion by plaintiff for extension of time to respond to motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response on or before November 13, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/5/15. No attached document. (dla) (Entered: 11/05/2015) |
2015-11-13 | 23 | MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (jlw) (Entered: 11/18/2015) |
2015-11-25 | 24 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 11/25/2015) |
2015-12-01 | 25 | ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support . Responses due by 12/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/1/15. (jlw) (Entered: 12/01/2015) |
2015-12-14 | 26 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 12/14/2015) |
2015-12-14 | 27 | MOTION for Declaration of Vexatious Litigant Status and Injunction Against Future Filings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 12/14/2015) |
2016-01-06 | 28 | REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 27 MOTION for Declaration of Vexatious Litigant Status and Injunction Against Future Filings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 01/06/2016) |
2016-01-08 | 29 | MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 27 MOTION for Declaration of Vexatious Litigant Status and Injunction Against Future Filings and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mailing Envelope)(jds) (Entered: 01/11/2016) |
2016-01-08 | 30 | MOTION and NOTICE for Extension of Time to File 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(jds) (Entered: 01/11/2016) |
2016-01-14 | 31 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum in Opposition and Notice of Unadvertised Closing of Court by Brady Eames (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(jlw) (Entered: 01/15/2016) |
2016-01-20 | 32 | REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 27 MOTION for Declaration of Vexatious Litigant Status and Injunction Against Future Filings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 01/20/2016) |
2016-01-20 | 33 | DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 27 MOTION for Declaration of Vexatious Litigant Status and Injunction Against Future Filings and Memorandum in Support Replies due by 2/5/2016. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/20/16. No attached document. (dla) (Entered: 01/20/2016) |
2016-03-16 | 34 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Office of the Federal Register, The, Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, 16 MOTION to Serve Supplemental Pleadings filed by Brady Eames. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/15/16. (jlw) Modified by removing term date on 6/24/2016 (blh). (Entered: 03/16/2016) |
2016-03-31 | 35 | ***WITHDRAWN per 39 Order*** ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: denying 16 Motion ; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/31/16. (jlw) Modified by adding withdrawn text on 5/5/2016 (blh). (Entered: 03/31/2016) |
2016-04-01 | 36 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support re 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, MOTION For Court Compliance and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(jds) (Entered: 04/01/2016) |
2016-04-04 | 37 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT signed by Anne Morgan, Chief Deputy: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. (jlw) (Entered: 04/04/2016) |
2016-04-25 | 38 | MOTION for Correction of Court Mistakes filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jlw) (Entered: 04/26/2016) |
2016-05-05 | 39 | ORDER: Re-Opening Case, Withdrawing Order Adopting Report & Recommendations, denying 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The time for objection to the Report and Recommendations shall be re-set. Any objection shall be due May 23, 2016. Failure to object may constitute waiver of objections upon subsequent review. See order for further details. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/5/2016. (blh) (Entered: 05/05/2016) |
2016-05-12 | 40 | MOTION for Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames (blh) (Entered: 05/13/2016) |
2016-05-31 | 41 | MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 40 MOTION for Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Administrative Committee of the Federal Register, The, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of the Federal Register, The. (Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 05/31/2016) |
2016-06-20 | 42 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION for Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Brady Eames (blh) (Entered: 06/21/2016) |
2016-06-23 | 43 | ORDER denying 40 Motion for Injunction. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/23/2016. (blh) (Entered: 06/23/2016) |
2016-06-24 | 44 | ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 Report and Recommendations; denying 16 Motion for Leave to Amend to Include Supplemental Claims; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/23/2016. (blh) (Entered: 06/24/2016) |
2016-08-02 | 45 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT-IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGEDthat Defendants Motion to Dismiss is granted, and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend is denied. Signed by Anne W. Morgan on 8/1/16. Case Closed. (jmr) (Entered: 08/02/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |