Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-07-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4167445) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (rd) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (No summons submitted at the time of initial filing) (rd) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-08 | 2 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by LONNIE J. PARKER filed by LONNIE J. PARKER.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015) |
2015-07-09 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/09/2015) |
2015-07-28 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-07-28 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-07-28 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 17, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/28/2015) |
2015-07-29 | | Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 9/17/2015. (ad) (Entered: 07/29/2015) |
2015-09-17 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/17/2015) |
2015-09-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 21, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/17/15. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/17/2015) |
2015-09-18 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 9/21/2015. (ad) (Entered: 09/18/2015) |
2015-09-21 | 7 | WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/02/2015.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration (Declaration of Ginae Barnett), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) Modified on 11/4/2015 (jf). (Entered: 09/21/2015) |
2015-09-22 | 8 | ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support), # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration (Declaration of Ginae Barnett), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/22/2015) |
2015-09-28 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AND FOR PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2015) |
2015-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by October 14, 2015; Defendant DOJ OPR's combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply shall be filed by November 3, 2015; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by November 20, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/29/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/29/2015) |
2015-09-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 10/14/2015; Defendant DOJ OPR's combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply shall be filed by 11/03/2015; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 11/20/2015. (ad) (Entered: 09/30/2015) |
2015-10-14 | 10 | MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter and Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie J. Parker and Exhibits D - E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015) |
2015-10-14 | 11 | RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie J. Parker & Exhibits D- E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015) |
2015-10-14 | 12 | RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie Parker & Exhibits D & E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015) |
2015-10-14 | 13 | MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie J. Parker & Exhibits D - E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015) |
2015-11-03 | 14 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ginae Barnett, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/03/2015) |
2015-11-03 | | The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 14 Consent Motion is GRANTED; 2) By January 15, 2016, the parties shall file either a joint status report or a proposed briefing schedule; 3) Defendant's 7 Motion for Summary Judgment is WITHDRAWN; and 4) Plaintiff's 10 and 13 Motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot given Defendant's agreement to process the documents and withdraw its Glomar response. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/3/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/03/2015) |
2015-11-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/15/2016. (tg) (Entered: 11/04/2015) |
2016-01-15 | 15 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File their Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/15/2016) |
2016-01-19 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file their Joint Status Report no later than February 10, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/19/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/19/2016) |
2016-01-19 | | Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file their Joint Status Report no later than 2/10/2016. (ad) (Entered: 01/19/2016) |
2016-02-08 | 16 | NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Ginae Barnett and Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ginae Barnett)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 02/08/2016) |
2016-02-08 | 17 | Vaughn Index from Defendant UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (See docket entry no. 16 to view document.) (ztd) (Entered: 02/09/2016) |
2016-02-10 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2016) |
2016-02-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' Joint 18 Proposed Briefing Schedule and ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than April 1, 2016; Plaintiff shall file a combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than April 29, 2016; and Defendant shall files its Combined Reply and Opposition by no later than May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 02/10/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/10/2016) |
2016-02-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/01/2016; Plaintiff shall file a combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than 4/29/2016; and Defendant shall files its Combined Reply and Opposition by no later than 5/20/2016. (ad) (Entered: 02/10/2016) |
2016-03-30 | 19 | Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2016) |
2016-03-30 | 20 | ERRATA (Corrected Proposed Order) by LONNIE J. PARKER 19 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2016) |
2016-03-31 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 19 Motion for Briefing Schedule; emailed to dstotter@qwestoffice.net, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Refile the Order only. It has the incorrect case number on it. Use the event under Notices,then select Notice of Proposed Order. (ztd, ) (Entered: 03/31/2016) |
2016-03-31 | 21 | ORDER granting 19 Consent Motion for Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER. Defendant DOJ shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/15/2016; Plaintiff Parker shall file his combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant DOJ's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 5/13/2016; Defendant DOJ shall file its combined Reply In Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 6/03/2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/31/2016. (ad) (Entered: 03/31/2016) |
2016-04-14 | 22 | MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 04/14/2016) |
2016-04-15 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than April 18, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 04/15/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/15/2016) |
2016-04-15 | | Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/18/2016. (ad) (Entered: 04/15/2016) |
2016-04-18 | 23 | MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Revised Third Declaration of Ginae Barnett), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 04/18/2016) |
2016-05-31 | 24 | Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule - To Modify Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2016) |
2016-05-31 | 25 | ERRATA Corrected Proposed Order on Consent Motion To Modify Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER 24 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule - To Modify Briefing Schedule filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2016) |
2016-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file his combined Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than June 24, 2016; Defendant shall file its combined Reply and Opposition by no later than July 29, 2016; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply by no later than August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 05/31/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/31/2016) |
2016-06-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file his combined Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than 6/24/2016; Defendant shall file its combined Reply and Opposition by no later than 7/29/2016; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply by no later than 8/12/2016. (ad) (Entered: 06/01/2016) |
2016-06-24 | 26 | Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) Modified on 6/27/2016 (td). (Entered: 06/24/2016) |
2016-06-24 | 27 | Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2016) |
2016-07-29 | 28 | Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fourth Declaration of Ginae Barnett))(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-07-29 | 29 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/29/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 30 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
2016-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by September 28, 2016, Defendant shall produce for in camera review copies of documents designated as OPR-3, -4, -9, and -75. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/26/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/26/2016) |
2016-09-27 | | Set/Reset Deadline: By 9/28/2016, Defendant shall produce for in camera review copies of documents designated as OPR-3, -4, -9, and -75. (ad) (Entered: 09/27/2016) |
2016-09-28 | 31 | NOTICE OF IN CAMERA REVIEW by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY re Order (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/28/2016) |
2016-10-12 | 32 | ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to all issues except the referral of documents to EOUSA. Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. By October 26, 2016, Defendant shall provide a Vaughn Index for the records referred by OPR to EOUSA and withheld in part or in full. Unless Plaintiff indicates his satisfaction, Defendant shall renew its Motion for Summary Judgment by November 18, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/12/2016. (lcjeb3) Modified on 10/12/2016 to include the word "Order" within the entry (ad). (Entered: 10/12/2016) |
2016-10-12 | 33 | MEMORANDUM OPINION re 32 Order on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/12/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/12/2016) |
2016-10-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: By 10/26/2016, Defendant shall provide a Vaughn Index for the records referred by OPR to EOUSA and withheld in part or in full. Unless Plaintiff indicates his satisfaction, Defendant shall renew its Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/18/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/12/2016) |
2016-10-26 | 34 | NOTICE of Filing Declaration and Vaughn Index from David Luczynski by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY re 32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David Luczynski)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/26/2016) |
2016-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report by December 12, 2016. Such report shall indicate whether Plaintiff is challenging the Vaughn Index submitted on October 26, 2016. If so, the parties shall propose a briefing schedule; if not, Plaintiff shall show cause why the case should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/6/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2016-12-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2016. (znbn) (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2016-12-09 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/09/2016) |
2016-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to 35 Joint Status Report, (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 17, 2017, (2) Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 17, 2017, (3) Defendant's reply and cross-opposition shall be due on or before March 15, 2017, and (4) Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be due on or before March 29, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/12/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/12/2016) |
2016-12-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/17/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/17/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2017. Cross-replies due by 3/29/2017 (nbn) (Entered: 12/12/2016) |
2017-01-17 | 36 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/17/2017) |
2017-01-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Consent 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 19, 2017, (2) Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 22, 2017, (3) Defendant's reply and cross-opposition shall be due on or before March 22, 2017, and (4) Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be due on or before April 10, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/18/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/18/2017) |
2017-01-18 | 37 | Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/18/2017) |
2017-01-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 19, 2017, Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 22, 2017, Defendant's reply and cross-opposition shall be due on or before March 22, 2017, and Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be due on or before April 10, 2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/23/2017) |
2017-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that this case is STAYED until February 8, 2017. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before February 22, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/23/2017) |
2017-01-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Stayed until 2/8/2017. Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/23/2017) |
2017-02-22 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2017) |
2017-02-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 38 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its renewed motion for summary judgment on or before March 15, 2017, (2) Plaintiff shall file his renewed cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion on or before April 24, 2017, (3) Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before June 2, 2017, and (4) Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/23/2017) |
2017-02-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its renewed motion for summary judgment on or before March 15, 2017. Plaintiff shall file his renewed cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion on or before April 24, 2017. Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before June 2, 2017. Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before July 7, 2017. (nbn) (Entered: 02/24/2017) |
2017-03-10 | 39 | MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Court's October 12, 2016 Order) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration (Declaration of David Luczynski), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/10/2017) |
2017-03-29 | 40 | MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2017) |
2017-03-29 | 41 | Memorandum in opposition to re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Court's October 12, 2016 Order) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2017) |
2017-06-02 | 42 | Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fifth Declaration of Ginae Barnett))(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/02/2017) |
2017-06-02 | 43 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Court's October 12, 2016 Order) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/02/2017) |
2017-07-07 | 44 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2017) |
2017-07-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, by July 24, 2017, the Government shall produce for in camera review a copy of the October 1999 draft letter from Paula J. Casey, referenced as an attachment to the May 26, 2000, letter from Casey. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/20/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/20/2017) |
2017-07-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Government shall produce for in camera review due by 7/24/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/20/2017) |
2017-07-27 | 45 | NOTICE (Notice of Submission of Document for In Camera Review) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY re Order, (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/27/2017) |
2017-08-16 | 46 | ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 40 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall release portions of the Casey Letter attachment on or before August 30, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/16/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/16/2017) |
2017-08-16 | 47 | MEMORANDUM OPINION re 46 Order on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/16/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/16/2017) |
2017-08-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall release portions of the Casey Letter attachment on or before 8/30/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 08/16/2017) |
Hide Docket Events |