Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-06-30 | 1 | LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Angenette Mosby. # 1 CV-71) (jtil). (Entered: 07/05/2016) |
2016-06-30 | 2 | NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Angenette Mosby. Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the CV-60 form attached. If you do not respond within 30 days of the date of this letter your action will be dismissed. Re Lodged Complaint 1 (jtil) (Entered: 07/05/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 3 | COMPLAINT against Defendant Karen E. Scott. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Walsh., filed by Plaintiff Angenette Mosby. (et) (Entered: 07/20/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 4 | REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Angenette Mosby. (et) (Entered: 07/20/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 5 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) (Entered: 07/20/2016) |
2016-07-18 | 6 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/20/2016) |
2016-07-21 | 7 | MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Denying Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 4 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The request to proceed in forma pauperis is denied because the complaint is frivolous and fails to state a claim. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed in spite of this, she must pay the filing fee within 30 days or the action will be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2016) |
2016-08-24 | 8 | JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee and IT IS ORDERED that the action be dismissed. (shb) (Entered: 08/24/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |