Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-07-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4614335) filed by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2016) |
2016-07-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-07-25 | 2 | SUMMONS (9)Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 07/25/2016) |
2016-08-11 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/08/2016. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/11/2016) |
2016-08-18 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS served on 8/15/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/18/2016) |
2016-08-18 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 8/4/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/18/2016) |
2016-08-19 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2016. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2016) |
2016-08-19 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 8/5/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2016) |
2016-08-19 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/4/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2016) |
2016-08-19 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/5/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2016) |
2016-08-25 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2016) |
2016-08-25 | 11 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2016) |
2016-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 defendants' consent motion for extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than October 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/28/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/28/2016) |
2016-08-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer or Response To Complaint due by 10/7/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/29/2016) |
2016-10-03 | 12 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2016) |
2016-10-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later November 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/4/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/04/2016) |
2016-10-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/7/2016. (mac) (Entered: 10/04/2016) |
2016-11-01 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/01/2016) |
2016-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 defendants' consent motion for extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than December 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/02/2016) |
2016-11-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/7/2016. (mac) (Entered: 11/02/2016) |
2016-12-05 | 14 | Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2016) |
2016-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 14 the parties' joint motion for entry of proposed scheduling order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern proceedings in this case: Defendants' deadline to respond to plaintiff's complaint shall be stayed pending completion of defendants' processing of plaintiff's requests for records under the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), or until further order of this Court. Within 60 days of the Court's entry of this Order, the parties shall submit a joint status report apprising the Court of the status of defendants' processing of plaintiff's FOIA requests. The parties shall file joint status reports within every 60 days thereafter, until defendants have completed processing plaintiff's FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/6/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2017-02-06 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2017) |
2017-04-07 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2017) |
2017-06-07 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/07/2017) |
2017-07-28 | 18 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/28/2017) |
2017-08-03 | 19 | MOTION to Sever by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2017) |
2017-08-07 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2017) |
2017-08-17 | 21 | Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Sever filed by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Francisco Martinez, # 2 Exhibit 1A - FOIA request to BIA, # 3 Exhibit 1B - FOIA request to CIA, # 4 Exhibit 1C - FOIA request to NSA, # 5 Exhibit 1D - FOIA request to ODNI, # 6 Exhibit 1E - FOIA requests to DOD, # 7 Exhibit 1F - FOIA requests to DHS, # 8 Exhibit 1G - FOIA requests to DOJ, # 9 Exhibit 2-8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2017) |
2017-08-21 | 22 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2017) |
2017-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 22 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file a reply. Defendants shall submit their Reply in Support of Motion to Sever by August 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/21/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/21/2017) |
2017-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion To Sever due by 8/31/2017. (mac) (Entered: 08/22/2017) |
2017-08-31 | 23 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION to Sever filed by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2017) |
2017-09-19 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/19/2017) |
2017-10-10 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2017) |
2017-12-11 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2017) |
2018-02-05 | 26 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2018) |
2018-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Status Report by February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/6/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/06/2018) |
2018-02-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2018. (kh) (Entered: 02/06/2018) |
2018-02-16 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/16/2018) |
2018-02-27 | 28 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 19 Motion to Sever. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/27/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/27/2018) |
2018-04-06 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2018) |
2018-06-08 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2018) |
2018-08-07 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-12-07 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2019-02-05 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, PATRICK M. SHANAHAN. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-06-07 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-12-06 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019) |
2020-02-06 | 40 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2020) |
2020-04-06 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2020) |
2020-06-05 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-08-04 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/04/2020) |
2020-10-05 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
2020-12-04 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2020) |
2021-02-02 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-04-05 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2021) |
2021-05-24 | 48 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Brian J. Field (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 05/24/2021) |
2021-06-02 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 06/02/2021) |
2021-08-03 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 08/03/2021) |
2021-10-01 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/01/2021) |
2021-10-18 | 52 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Anna Walker on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kathleen A. Molen (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/18/2021) |
2021-11-30 | 53 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/30/2021) |
2022-01-28 | 54 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-03-29 | 55 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/29/2022) |
2022-04-17 | 56 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 04/17/2022) |
2022-06-01 | 57 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/01/2022) |
2022-06-03 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 57 Consent Motion for Extension of Time Within to File Joint Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by June 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/3/2022. (lctjk1) (Entered: 06/03/2022) |
2022-06-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/8/2022. (zkh) (Entered: 06/06/2022) |
2022-06-08 | 58 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 06/08/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 59 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-09-16 | 60 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Processing Schedule by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/16/2022) |
2022-09-19 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 60 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, Plaintiff's 60 motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the briefing for Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to increase the FBI's current processing rate will proceed according to the briefing schedule proposed by the parties. Plaintiff will file its motion by September 19, 2022; Defendant shall file any response by October 16, 2022; and Plaintiff shall reply by November 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/19/2022. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 61 | MOTION for Order Processing Schedule by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-10-07 | 62 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 63 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-13 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's 63 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Processing Schedule by November 15, 2022, and Plaintiff shall file any reply by December 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/13/2022. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/13/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 64 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 61 MOTION for Order Processing Schedule by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's 64 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Defendant's 64 motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Processing Schedule by November 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/15/2022. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-11-22 | 65 | RESPONSE re 61 MOTION for Order Processing Schedule filed by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joseph E. Bender, Jr., # 2 Exhibit A-P)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2022-12-06 | 66 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2022-12-15 | 67 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 61 MOTION for Order Processing Schedule filed by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2023-02-03 | 68 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 69 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-06-05 | 70 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 71 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
2023-09-27 | 72 | ORDER denying Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Order Processing Schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/27/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 73 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 74 | MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion for Order , MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 75 | NOTICE of filing of Corrected Motion by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ re 74 Motion to Amend/Correct, Motion for Certification for interlocatory appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Motion)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 76 | NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 72 Order on Motion for Order by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-10475494. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-07 | 77 | Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re 76 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth) (Entered: 11/07/2023) |
2023-11-08 | 78 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion for Order MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/08/2023) |
2023-11-10 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's 78 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's 74 , 75 motion to amend order. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, that the Government's 78 unopposed motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Government shall file any response to Plaintiff's 74 , 75 motion by November 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/10/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/10/2023) |
2023-11-27 | | USCA Case Number 23-5270 for 76 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (znmw) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 79 | ORDER of USCA as to 76 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ; holding case in abeyance panding district court's resolution of motion to amend; USCA Case Number 23-5270. (znmw) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-30 | 80 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion for Order MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
2023-12-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's 80 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's 74 , 75 motion to amend order. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, that the Government's 80 unopposed motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Government shall file any response to Plaintiff's 74 , 75 motion by December 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/1/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2023-12-01 | 81 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2023-12-18 | 82 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion for Order MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal , Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
2023-12-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant FBI's 82 Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Amend Order and for Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's 82 unopposed motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's 74 motion by January 11, 2024, and Plaintiff shall file any reply in support of his 74 motion by January 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/20/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2024-01-11 | 83 | RESPONSE re 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion for Order MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and [75-1] Corrected Motion filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/11/2024) |
2024-01-29 | 84 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Order on Motion for Order MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal filed by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
2024-01-30 | 85 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/30/2024) |
2024-02-28 | | NOTICE of Hearing: VTC Status Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM (Public Audio Line Available) before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zkh) (Entered: 02/28/2024) |
2024-03-05 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: VTC Status Conference held on 3/5/2024. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court intends to sua sponte reconsider Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Processing Schedule, should the Court regain jurisdiction to do so because the appeal of the Court's 72 Order resolving that motion is withdrawn. It is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to avail himself of Rule 62.1 instead, he may file a motion to reconsider the Court's 72 Order by March 11, 2024, and the Court will issue an indicative ruling that it would grant the motion, insofar as it intends to vacate the 72 Order and hear from the parties before deciding the 61 Motion. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/5/2024. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 3/11/2024. (zkh) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-08 | 86 | MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order on Motion for Order and Indicative Ruling by FRANCISCO E MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |