Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2017-01-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 01/12/2017) |
2017-01-11 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by IBRAHIM ELGABRONY (td). (Entered: 01/12/2017) |
2017-01-11 | 3 | PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 01/12/2017) |
2017-01-11 | 4 | ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $17.74 from Prison Account of IBRAHIM ELGABRONY and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/9/17. (td) . (Entered: 01/12/2017) |
2017-01-11 | 5 | ORDERED that this civil action shall proceed under the Freedom of Information Act against the Central Intelligence Agency, the United States Department of Justice and the United States Department of State. John O. Brennan, Loretta E. Lynch and John Kerry are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as party defendants. (See order for further details.). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/9/17. (td) (Entered: 01/12/2017) |
2017-01-17 | 6 | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) (Entered: 01/18/2017) |
2017-01-30 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LORETTA E. LYNCH served on 1/25/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/25/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/25/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2017.) (jf) (Entered: 01/31/2017) |
2017-02-14 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from IBRAHIM ELGABRONY in the amount of $17.74, receipt number: 4616082941. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2017) |
2017-02-15 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to Defendant U.S. Department of State. (td) (Entered: 02/27/2017) |
2017-03-21 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 2/6/2017 (td) (Entered: 03/22/2017) |
2017-03-24 | 10 | First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 03/24/2017) |
2017-03-27 | 11 | NOTICE of Change of Address by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 03/29/2017) |
2017-03-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 10 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by April 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/29/17. (ms) (Entered: 03/29/2017) |
2017-03-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/26/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/30/2017) |
2017-03-31 | 12 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Wynne Kelly (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2017) |
2017-04-13 | 13 | Mail Returned as undeliverable: Minute Order filed on 03/29/17 was returned and re-mailed to the defendant. Defendant's registration number was wrong. Minute Order re-mailed on 04/13/17. (tb) (Entered: 04/13/2017) |
2017-04-21 | 14 | Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Document by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2017) |
2017-04-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 14 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by June 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/24/17. (ms) (Entered: 04/24/2017) |
2017-04-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/12/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/25/2017) |
2017-06-12 | 15 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2017) |
2017-06-14 | 16 | ORDER directing defendants to file a status report by July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/14/17. (ms) (Entered: 06/14/2017) |
2017-06-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/7/2017. (tb) (Entered: 06/14/2017) |
2017-06-29 | 17 | MOTION for Leave to File for Plaintiff to submit his first Amended Complaint by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(td) (Entered: 06/30/2017) |
2017-07-07 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/07/2017) |
2017-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed "Motion for a Court Leave for Plaintiff to Submit His First Amended Complaint" 17 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by July 28, 2017, and shall file a Status Report by August 4, 2017 on the progress of their production of records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request(s). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/7/17. (ms) (Entered: 07/07/2017) |
2017-07-07 | 25 | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 5, # 2 Part 3 of 5, # 3 Part 4 of 5, # 4 Part 5 of 5)(td) (Entered: 09/18/2017) |
2017-07-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/28/2017. Status Report due by 8/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/10/2017) |
2017-07-11 | 19 | MOTION to Clarify by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/11/2017) |
2017-07-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 19 Motion to Clarify. Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by July 28, 2017, and shall file a Status Report by August 4, 2017, on the progress of their production of records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request(s). Defendants shall be relieved of the obligation to respond to the Amended Complaint in full and may instead file a Supplemental Answer that solely responds to paragraphs 75 to 80 and 115 to 118 of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/25/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/25/2017) |
2017-07-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/28/2017. Status Report due by 8/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/26/2017) |
2017-07-28 | 20 | ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/28/2017) |
2017-08-04 | 21 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/04/2017) |
2017-08-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of 21 Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Status Report by September 5, 2017 on the progress of the agencies' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests and a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/7/17. (ms) (Entered: 08/07/2017) |
2017-08-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Status Report due by 9/5/2017. (tb) (Entered: 08/07/2017) |
2017-08-17 | 22 | NOTICE correcting inmate number by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 08/21/2017) |
2017-09-05 | 23 | MOTION for Extension of Time to file Status Report by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/05/2017) |
2017-09-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. Defendant shall file a Status Report, proposed schedule and proposed order by by 9/12/17. The Court will view further requests for an extension with disfavor. Additionally, the Defendant shall resend a copy of its motion 23 to the Plaintiff using his correct inmate number (R28054-054) and file an updated certificate of service. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY, R28054-054, ELKTON FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 10, LISBON, OH 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/06/2017) |
2017-09-06 | 24 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2017) |
2017-09-14 | 26 | MOTION to Amend/Correct 25 1st Amended Complaint by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 09/18/2017) |
2017-09-28 | 27 | RESPONSE (Opposition) re 24 Status Report filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (td) (Entered: 10/02/2017) |
2017-10-18 | 28 | ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/18/2017) |
2017-10-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed "Motion for a Court Leave for Plaintiff to Submit his Second Amended Complaint" 26 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Status Report by November 20, 2017 on the progress of the agencies' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests and a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/19/17. (ms) (Entered: 10/19/2017) |
2017-10-19 | 29 | SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(znmw) (Entered: 10/20/2017) |
2017-10-24 | 30 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 28 Answer to Complaint, . (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2017) |
2017-11-22 | 31 | MOTION for Leave to File Status Report Nunc Pro Tunc by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Status Report)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2017) |
2017-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Status Report, Nunc Pro Tunc 31 is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their next Status Report by December 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/27/17. (ms) (Entered: 11/27/2017) |
2017-11-27 | 32 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Nunc Pro Tunc to 11/22/17.) (td) (Entered: 11/28/2017) |
2017-11-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/22/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/28/2017) |
2017-12-07 | 33 | RESPONSE re 32 Status Report filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (td) (Entered: 12/12/2017) |
2017-12-22 | 34 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 12/22/2017) |
2018-01-03 | 35 | RESPONSE (Opposition) re 34 Status Report filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (td) (Entered: 01/05/2018) |
2018-01-17 | 36 | ORDER directing defendants to file by March 1, 2018 a report on the status of plaintiff's FOIA requests to the CIA and the State Department, and a dispositive motion on the FBI's and the EOUSA's responses to plaintiff's FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/17/2018) |
2018-01-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report regarding plaintiff's FOIA requests due by 3/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 01/22/2018) |
2018-02-28 | 37 | MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2018) |
2018-03-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 37 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation and Executive Office for United States Attorneys shall file their dispositive motion by April 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/5/18. (ms) (Entered: 03/05/2018) |
2018-03-05 | 38 | MOTION for Leave to File Nunc Pro Tunc Status Report by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Status Report)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2018) |
2018-03-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 4/2/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/06/2018) |
2018-03-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Leave to File Status Report, Nunc Pro Tunc 38 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, by April 2, 2018, defendants shall file a status report regarding the responses of the Central Intelligence Agency and the State Department to plaintiff's FOIA requests. With respect to the Central Intelligence Agency, defendants shall file a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/6/18. (ms) (Entered: 03/06/2018) |
2018-03-06 | 39 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Granted Nunc Pro Tunc per Minute Order filed 3/6/18) (td) (Entered: 03/07/2018) |
2018-03-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/2/2018. (tb) (Entered: 03/07/2018) |
2018-03-30 | 40 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2018) |
2018-04-02 | 41 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/02/2018) |
2018-04-04 | 42 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2018) |
2018-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' 40 41 Motions for Extensions of Time are GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED the dispositive motion(s) on behalf of the Federal Bureau of Investigation and the Executive Office for United States Attorneys are due by May 17, 2018. No further extensions will be granted for these Defendants absent extraordinary circumstances. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the summary judgment motion on behalf of the Central Intelligence Agency is due by June 11, 2018; Plaintiff's opposition and combined cross-motion are due by July 11, 2018; CIA's reply and combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion are due by August 10, 2018; Plaintiff's reply is due by September 10, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a report on the status of the U.S. Department of State's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request is due by May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/2018. (dm) (Entered: 04/11/2018) |
2018-04-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: FBI and the Executive office for US Attorneys dispositive motion(s) due by 5/17/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/11/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 7/11/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/10/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/10/2018. Status Report on the U.S Department of State's response to plaintiff's FOIA request due by 5/7/2018. (tb) (Entered: 04/12/2018) |
2018-05-04 | 44 | MOTION for Extension of Time for filing of Dispositive Motions by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (td) (Entered: 05/08/2018) |
2018-05-07 | 43 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2018) |
2018-05-17 | 45 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants FBI and EOUSA by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/17/2018) |
2018-06-07 | 46 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2018) |
2018-06-08 | | It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 44 is GRANTED. The Court also GRANTS Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion 46 . It is ORDERED that there will be no further extensions granted for this Defendant absent extraordinary circumstances. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the summary judgment motion on behalf of the Central Intelligence Agency is now due by June 25, 2018; Plaintiff's opposition and combined cross-motion are now due by July 25, 2018; CIA's reply and combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion are now due by August 27, 2018; Plaintiff's reply is now due by September 27, 2018. ORDER signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/8/18. (dm) (Entered: 06/08/2018) |
2018-06-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/25/2018. Response and Cross Motion due by 7/25/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/27/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/27/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/08/2018) |
2018-06-25 | 47 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, E (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) Modified filers on 7/2/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/25/2018) |
2018-07-16 | 48 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 07/17/2018) |
2018-07-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 48 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition and combined cross-motion are now due by September 7, 2018; CIA's reply and combined opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion are now due by October 8, 2018; Plaintiff's reply is now due by November 8, 2018. ORDER Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 07/25/18. (dm) (Entered: 07/25/2018) |
2018-07-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 9/7/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/8/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/8/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/7/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/26/2018) |
2018-07-31 | 49 | Fox/Neal Order advising Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by September 7, 2018, or the court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 07/31/2018. (dm) (Entered: 07/31/2018) |
2018-08-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 9/7/2008. (tb) (Entered: 08/01/2018) |
2018-08-31 | 50 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 09/07/2018) |
2018-09-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 50 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition and Combined Cross-Motion are now due by September 28, 2018; CIA's Reply and Combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion are now due by October 29, 2018; Plaintiff's Reply is now due by November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/11/2018. (dm) (Entered: 09/11/2018) |
2018-09-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response and Cross Motion due by 9/28/2018. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 10/29/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/30/2018.(tb) (Entered: 09/12/2018) |
2018-10-01 | 51 | MOTION for Extension of Time to submit one remaining part of his combined motion for summary judgment by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Combined Motion for Summary Judgment)(ztd) (Entered: 10/03/2018) |
2018-10-04 | 52 | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING ONLY Plaintiff's Motion for Extension to File Supplement to his Opposition and Combined Cross-Motion. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Supplement shall be filed by 10/12/2018. It is further ORDERED that the Supplement shall not exceed ten pages. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/2018. (dm) (Entered: 10/04/2018) |
2018-10-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental to opposition due by 10/12/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/05/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 53 | RESPONSE re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (ztd) (Entered: 10/15/2018) |
2018-10-26 | 54 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/26/2018) |
2018-11-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The court takes notice that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time [51, 51-1] also contains his combined Motion for Summary Judgment/Opposition and corresponding exhibits, as well as two Motions to Strike, and two Motions for Discovery/In Camera Inspection. Notwithstanding the combined nature of the filing [51, 51-1], the court will address all of Plaintiff's motions therein. The court also acknowledges that Plaintiff filed a timely Supplemental Response to Summary Judgment 53 . Defendants filed a timely Reply 54 to Plaintiff's Opposition and Supplemental Response. There shall be no further briefing in this matter without leave of court. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/2018. (dm) (Entered: 11/26/2018) |
2018-12-18 | 55 | MOTION for Leave to File by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Relpy)(ztd) (Entered: 12/19/2018) |
2018-12-18 | 56 | MOTION for Court to Conduct In Camera Inspection to the 1994 CIA's Exhibit (C) by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) Modified on 1/7/2019 to delete pages that were adding in error (zrdj). (Entered: 12/19/2018) |
2018-12-20 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING only 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File his Reply to Defendant's Cross-Motion Nunc Pro Tunc. The court will consider Plaintiff's Reply despite its filing beyond the November 30, 2018 deadline. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/2018. (dm) (Entered: 12/20/2018) |
2018-12-20 | 57 | SURREPLY to re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Nunc Pro Tunc pursuant to Minute Order filed 12/20/18) (ztd) (Entered: 12/27/2018) |
2019-03-31 | 58 | MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING FBI's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; DENYING EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part CIA's Motion for Summary Judgment 47 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 51 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Stone Declaration [51 at 33-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Hardy Declaration [51 at 37-40]; DENYING Plaintiff's First Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 41-4]; DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 45-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Third Motion for In Camera Review 56 . See document for further details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2019. (dm) (Entered: 03/31/2019) |
2019-03-31 | 59 | ORDER GRANTING FBI's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; DENYING EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 ; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part CIA's Motion for Summary Judgment 47 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 51 ; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Stone Declaration [51 at 33-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Hardy Declaration [51 at 37-40]; DENYING Plaintiff's First Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 41-4]; DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion for In Camera Review & Discovery [51 at 45-6]; DENYING Plaintiff's Third Motion for In Camera Review 56 . CIA shall file either a renewed motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule, on or before May 4, 2019. The motion or status report shall address FOIA/Privacy Act Request No. P-2014-00346. EOUSA shall file either a renewed motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule, on or before May 4, 2019. The motion or status report and address FOIA/Privacy Act Request Nos. FOIA-2014-02098, FOIA-2016-04133, and the unassigned Request dated September 30, 2015. Department of State shall file a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule, on or before May 4, 2019. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2019. (dm) (Entered: 03/31/2019) |
2019-04-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/4/2019. CIA renewed motion for summary judgment due by 5/4/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 60 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that EOUSA and CIA's 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that EOUSA and CIA's Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment shall be filed by 6/3/2019. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY, R28054-054, ELKTON FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 10, LISBON, OH 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/1/2019. (dm) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/3/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 61 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 62 | MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Stone Decl. (ECF No. 45-4), # 4 Declaration Hodge Decl. (Exh. A), # 5 Attach. 1 to Hodge Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 61 CIA's Second Motion for Extension to File Renewed Disposition Motion. CIA shall file a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by July 18, 2019. The Court will view further requests for an extension with disfavor. Further, the Department of State neither filed a status report by its 59 court ordered deadline of May 4, 2019, nor requested any extension. The Department of State shall file a report addressing the status of production and (if applicable) proposing a briefing schedule by June 21, 2019, and in the report, must address the reasons for its delay in such filing. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY, R28054-054, ELKTON FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 10, LISBON, OH 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/6/2019. (dm) (Entered: 06/06/2019) |
2019-06-06 | 63 | Fox/Neal Order advising Plaintiff to respond to EOUSA's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment 62 by July 9, 2019, or the court may deem matter as conceded. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY, R28054-054, ELKTON FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 10, LISBON, OH 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/6/2019. (dm) (Entered: 06/06/2019) |
2019-06-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/9/2019. (tb) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/21/2019. Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 7/18/2019. (tb) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-11 | 64 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/11/2019) |
2019-07-08 | 65 | MOTION for Extension of Time by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (tth) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and his opposition or other response to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is due by August 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/15/19. (ms) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-07-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2019. (tb) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-07-18 | 66 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/18/2019) |
2019-08-26 | 67 | RESPONSE re 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ztd) (Entered: 08/28/2019) |
2019-08-26 | 68 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd); ("Leave to file Granted" signed 8/26/19 by Judge Tanya Chutkan) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of defendants' status reports, ECF Nos. 64 and 66 , by September 20, 2019, defendants shall file status report(s) regarding plaintiff's FOIA requests to the Central Intelligence Agency and the U.S. Department of State. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/29/19. (ms) (Entered: 08/29/2019) |
2019-09-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/20/2019. (tb) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-09-20 | 69 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/20/2019) |
2019-10-22 | 70 | ORDER GRANTING nunc pro tunc 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition and deeming timely 67 Plaintiff's Opposition to EOUSA's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further ORDERED that, based on 69 Defendants' Joint Status Report, CIA shall file another status report on or before October 31, 2019, and the State Department shall propose a briefing schedule on or before October 31, 2019. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/22/2019. (dm) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-10-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: CIA's status report due by 10/31/2019; State Department's proposed briefing schedule due by 10/31/2019. (tg) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 71 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File, Nunc Pro Tunc, EOUSA's Reply, State's Proposed Briefing Schedule, and CIA's Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 72 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 73 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the CIA and State Department's Motion for Extension of Time to File Nunc Pro Tunc 71 is GRANTED. The parties are reminded that pleadings filed outside of the court's deadlines without a motion for extension of time may result in the pleading being stricken. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report by January 22, 2020, indicating whether he intends to challenge the CIA and/or State Department responses to his FOIA and/or Privacy Act requests, and if so, detailing the bases for those challenges. If appropriate, CIA and State Department shall file their dispositive motions by February 21, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/27/2019. (dm) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a status report by 1/22/2020, indicating whether he intends to challenge the CIA and/or State Department responses to his FOIA and/or Privacy Act requests, and if so, detailing the bases for those challenges. If appropriate, CIA and State Department shall file their dispositive motions by 2/21/2020. (jth) (Entered: 12/01/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 74 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Chang on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney JOSHUA ROGERS (Chang, William) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 75 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that EOUSA's 75 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's 67 Opposition to EOUSA's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and EOUSA shall file its Reply on or before January 22, 2020, addressing all of the directives contained within this court's 59 March 31, 2019 Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions and any additional requests for extensions by Defendant shall be considered with extreme disfavor. Plaintiff shall file a Surreply on or before March 2, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/12/2019. (dm) (Entered: 12/12/2019) |
2019-12-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/22/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2020-01-22 | 76 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Chang, William) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-27 | 77 | MOTION for Extension of Time by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on or before February 21, 2020, indicating whether he intends to challenge the CIA and/or State Department responses to his FOIA and/or Privacy Act requests, and if so, detailing the bases for those challenges. If appropriate, CIA and State Department shall file their dispositive motions by March 23, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/31/2020. (dm) (Entered: 01/31/2020) |
2020-01-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 3/23/2020. Plaintiff's Status Report due by 2/21/2020. (tb) (Entered: 01/31/2020) |
2020-03-03 | 78 | MOTION for Leave to File by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ztd) (Entered: 03/04/2020) |
2020-03-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Leave to File Status Report (Attached to Motion), Nunc Pro Tunc is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that CIA & State Department shall file their dispositive motions by April 6, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/5/2020. (dm) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-05 | 79 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 03/09/2020) |
2020-03-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply to EOUSA's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's Surreply is now due by March 16, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/9/2020. (dm) (Entered: 03/09/2020) |
2020-03-09 | 80 | STATUS REPORT by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (ztd) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-03-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive motion due by 4/6/2020. Surreply due by 3/16/2020. (tb) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-20 | 81 | SURREPLY to re 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY. (ztd) (Entered: 03/23/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 82 | MEMORANDUM OPINION granting EOUSA's 62 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the case against EOUSA and DOJ with prejudice. Please see Memorandum Opinion and accompanying Order 83 for further details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/25/2020. (dm) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 83 | ORDER granting EOUSA's 62 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the case against it and DOJ with prejudice; and denying Plaintiff's [67-1] Fourth Motion for In Camera Review. See Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion 82 for details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/25/2020. (dm) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-04-06 | 84 | MOTION to Stay Proceedings by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 04/06/2020) |
2020-04-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 84 CIA & State Department's Motion to Stay. This action is hereby STAYED pending further order of the court. CIA & State Department shall file a status report by June 8, 2020, advising the court whether operations have resumed, except that to the extent operations have resumed, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/7/2020. (dm) (Entered: 04/07/2020) |
2020-04-10 | 85 | MOTION for Extension of Time by IBRAHIM ELGABROWNY (ztd) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 82 Memorandum Opinion and 83 Order. This matter is currently STAYED. Upon the lift of the stay, and pending further order of court, Plaintiff may file a motion for consideration. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/15/2020. (dm) (Entered: 04/15/2020) |
2020-06-08 | 86 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 06/08/2020) |
2020-07-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Defendants' 86 status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case remain STAYED. Defendants shall file a status report by August 31, 2020, advising the court as to the extent that operations have resumed. The report shall be accompanied by a progress report and/or a proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/2/2020. (dm) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/31/2020. Status Report due by 8/31/2020. (tb) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-08-28 | 87 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 08/28/2020) |
2020-08-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Defendants' 87 status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case remain STAYED. Defendants shall file a status report by October 30, 2020, advising the court as to the extent that operations have resumed. The report shall be accompanied by a progress report and/or a proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/31/2020. (psu3) (Entered: 08/31/2020) |
2020-09-01 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Defendants' Status Report is due by 10/30/2020. (jth) (Entered: 09/01/2020) |
2020-10-30 | 88 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 10/30/2020) |
2020-11-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Defendants' 88 status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case remain STAYED. Defendants shall file a status report by December 30, 2020, advising the court as to the extent that operations have resumed. The report shall be accompanied by a progress report and/or a proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/3/2020. (psu3) (Entered: 11/03/2020) |
2020-11-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/30/2020. (tb) (Entered: 11/04/2020) |
2020-11-06 | 89 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Cuong Truong on behalf of JOHN BERNNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JOHN KERRY, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney William Chang (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/06/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 90 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2021-01-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Defendants' 90 status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case remain STAYED. Defendants shall file a renewed status report by March 30, 2021, advising the court as to the extent that operations have resumed. The report shall be accompanied by a progress report and/or a proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/5/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Status Report and Progress Report due by 3/30/2021. (tb) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-03-30 | 91 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021) |
2021-04-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Defendants' 91 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case remain STAYED. Defendants shall file a renewed status report by May 27, 2021, containing a progress report advising the court as to the extent that operations have resumed and explaining what measures have been taken to return to normal operations and/or including a proposed briefing schedule. The State Department shall also specifically advise the court as to when it anticipates moving out of Phase I. To the extent that CIA and the State Department are still limited in their ability to litigate this matter, due to telework and other restrictions, both agencies must specify the tasks that they can accomplish in the interim, notwithstanding these inconveniences. While the court is certainly understanding of the hardships created by the COVID-19 pandemic, this matter has been stayed for a year, and has been pending against these Defendants for over four years. Prior to the stay, CIA and the State Department both indicated that they had completed their review and release of documents, and both agencies had proposed briefing schedules and/or expressed their preparedness to proceed with dispositive motions. See, e.g., Status Reports, ECF Nos. 72, 73. For all of these reasons, any future requests by Defendants to extend the stay may be viewed with disfavor. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to: Ibrahim Elgabrowny, R28054-054, Elkton Federal Correctional Institution, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 10, Lisbon, OH, 44432. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/7/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Status Report due by 5/27/2021. (tb) (Entered: 04/09/2021) |
2021-05-27 | 92 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/27/2021) |
2021-06-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Defendants' 92 Status Report, it is ORDERED that the STAY in this case is hereby LIFTED. The court will, however, hold Defendants' request for entry of a briefing schedule in abeyance. A search of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' database reveals that Plaintiff is no longer in federal custody. Because Plaintiff is seemingly no longer incarcerated, it will allow the parties an opportunity to meet and confer regarding a proposed mutually agreeable briefing schedule. Plaintiff, however, has failed to provide an updated address, and a notice of change in address or telephone number must be filed within 14 days of the change. See D.C. Local Civil Rules 5.1(c)(1) and 11.1. Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice of change of address, containing his full residence address, telephone number, and any other pertinent contact information, by July 9, 2021. Plaintiff's failure to comply will result in the entry of a briefing schedule without his input. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the Plaintiff at his most recent address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/10/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-06-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of change of address due by 7/9/2021. (tb) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-08-20 | 93 | Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Minute Order filed on 06/10/2021 was returned undeliverable. No forwarding address provided. (tb) (Entered: 08/20/2021) |
2021-08-20 | 94 | MOTION to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/20/2021) |
2021-08-20 | 95 | MOTION for Order to Show Cause by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/20/2021) |
2021-09-09 | 96 | ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 95 Motion for Order to Show Cause and directing Plaintiff, by October 11, 2021, to show cause in writing as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and D.C. Local Civil Rule 83.23. If Plaintiff fails to file a timely response, the court may consider Defendants' 94 Motion to Dismiss without his input, and/or dismiss the remaining claims in this matter without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the court will hold Defendants' 94 Motion to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution, ECF No. 94, in abeyance pending Plaintiff's response, if any, to this Order to Show Cause. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff at his most recent address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/9/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 09/09/2021) |
2021-09-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 10/11/2021. (tb) (Entered: 09/10/2021) |
2021-10-27 | 97 | MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING the Motion to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) 94 filed by Defendants, the United States Department of State and the Central Intelligence Agency. Accordingly, the case against them is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and D.C. Local Civil Rule 83.23. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and the accompanying Order 98 to Plaintiff at his current address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/27/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
2021-10-27 | 98 | ORDER GRANTING the Motion to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) 94 filed by Defendants, the United States Department of State and the Central Intelligence Agency. Accordingly, the case against them is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and D.C. Local Civil Rule 83.23. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order and the accompanying Memorandum Opinion 97 to Plaintiff at his current address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/27/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |