Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2017-08-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5070969) filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/11/2017) |
2017-08-11 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017) |
2017-08-14 | 2 | SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017) |
2017-08-14 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (FOIA SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 08/14/2017) |
2017-08-14 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General re 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA.(Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/14/2017) |
2017-08-14 | 4 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia re 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA.(Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/14/2017) |
2017-08-15 | 5 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (nmw) (Entered: 08/15/2017) |
2017-08-30 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2017. (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017) |
2017-08-30 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/22/2017. (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017) |
2017-08-30 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 8/21/2017 (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017) |
2017-09-21 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/21/2017) |
2017-09-21 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/21/2017) |
2017-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by October 6, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/22/17. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/22/2017) |
2017-09-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by 10/6/2017. (jth) (Entered: 09/22/2017) |
2017-10-06 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/06/2017) |
2017-10-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the schedule agreed to by the parties in Paragraph 14 of their 11 Joint Status Report is hereby ADOPTED, subject to Plaintiff's reservation set forth in Paragraph 15. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/10/17. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/10/2017) |
2017-10-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 10/10/2017) |
2017-11-29 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2017) |
2017-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the processing schedule set out in paragraph 12 of the 12 Joint Status Report, subject to Plaintiff's reservations in paragraph 14. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/5/17. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/05/2017) |
2017-12-05 | 13 | ENTERED IN ERROR...ORDER referring this action to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for full case management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/5/17. (lcjeb1) Modified on 12/5/2017 (lcjeb1, ). Modified on 12/6/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/05/2017) |
2018-01-11 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2018) |
2018-02-15 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/15/2018) |
2018-03-12 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/12/2018) |
2018-04-16 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2018) |
2018-05-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: As the parties have not filed their required 30-day report, the Court ORDERS that they shall do so by May 29, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/24/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/24/2018) |
2018-05-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/24/2018) |
2018-05-29 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2018) |
2018-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the Parties' 18 status report the Court ORDERS that 1) the Parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 1, 2018 identifying what, if any, issues remain for dispositive motions and proposing a schedule for further proceedings; and 2) the current Scheduling Order is amended to provide that the Parties are no longer to required to submit joint status reports every thirty days. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/29/2018) |
2018-05-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 05/29/2018) |
2018-07-02 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2018) |
2018-07-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 19 status report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report on or before August 17, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/3/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/03/2018) |
2018-07-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 07/05/2018) |
2018-08-17 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2018) |
2018-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties 20 status report and ORDERS that they shall file a further status report on or before September 21, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/17/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/17/2018) |
2018-08-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-09-20 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2018) |
2018-09-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 21 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further status report on or before October 22, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/21/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/21/2018) |
2018-09-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/21/2018) |
2018-10-22 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2018) |
2018-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 22 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further status report on or before November 30, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/22/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/22/2018) |
2018-10-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/23/2018) |
2018-11-29 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 23 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further status report on or before January 4, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/29/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-11-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/30/2018) |
2019-01-04 | 24 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019) |
2019-01-07 | | MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion to Stay. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/7/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/07/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 25 | NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court lifts the stay entered on 1/7/2019 and ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint status report by February 20, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/6/2019. (lcjeb1) Modified on 2/6/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-20 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2019) |
2019-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 26 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 22, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-02-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. (Sullivan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 27 joint status report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report on or before April 26, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 28 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 10, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/29/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 29 | NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 29 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/10/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |