Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-01-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security (DHS) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637031460.), filed by Terry Cochran. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 certificate of service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 proposed summons)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2018) |
2018-01-31 | 2 | ORDER Directing clerk to prepare and issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/31/2018. (c/m 1/31/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2018) |
2018-01-31 | 3 | Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (c/m 1/31/18 bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/31/2018) |
2018-02-05 | 4 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cochran. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) served on 2/3/2018, answer due 4/4/2018.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2018) |
2018-02-26 | 5 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00200-ELH, 1:18-cv-00201-ELH, 1:18-cv-00202-ELH(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 02/26/2018) |
2018-02-26 | 6 | ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/26/2018. (c/m 2/26/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2018) |
2018-04-04 | 7 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 04/04/2018) |
2018-04-06 | 8 | ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/5/2018. (c/m 4/6/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) . (Entered: 04/06/2018) |
2018-04-18 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Chalpin on behalf of Terry Cochran (Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2018) |
2018-05-02 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 05/02/2018) |
2018-05-02 | 11 | ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/2/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/03/2018) |
2018-05-07 | 12 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Homeland Security (DHS).(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 05/07/2018) |
2018-05-07 | 13 | Consent MOTION to Stay the Case by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 05/07/2018) |
2018-05-07 | 14 | ORDER Granting 13 Consent Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/7/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2018) |
2018-06-06 | 15 | Status Report Submitted pursuant to Court's Order (ECF 14) by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/06/2018) |
2018-07-10 | 16 | Status Report Submitted in accordance with ECF 14 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/10/2018) |
2018-08-09 | 17 | Status Report Submitted pursuant to ECF 14 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 08/09/2018) |
2018-08-18 | 18 | Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terry Cochran (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chalpin, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2018) |
2018-08-20 | 19 | ORDER Granting 18 Consent Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark G Chalpin terminated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/20/2018. (c/m 8/20/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-20 | 20 | Correspondence sent to plaintiff re: Withdrawal of Attorney Appearance. (c/m 8/20/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-09-07 | 21 | Status Report Submitted in accordance with ECF 14 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 09/07/2018) |
2018-09-07 | 22 | MARGINAL ORDER Approving 21 Status Report Submitted filed by Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/7/2018. (c/m 9/10/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/10/2018) |
2018-10-22 | 23 | Status Report Submitted in accordance with ECF 22 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 10/22/2018) |
2018-11-09 | 24 | Status Report Submitted in accordance with ECF 14 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018) |
2018-12-11 | 25 | Status Report Submitted pursuant to ECF Nos. 14 and 22 by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/11/2018) |
2018-12-26 | 26 | MOTION for Extension of Time and to Modify Proposed Briefing Schedule by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/26/2018) |
2018-12-26 | 27 | ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Modify Proposed Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/26/2018. (c/m 12/27/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2018) |
2019-01-11 | 28 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-11 | 29 | ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/11/2019. (c/m 01/14/2019 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2019) |
2019-02-08 | 30 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 02/08/2019) |
2019-02-11 | 31 | Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Terry Cochran (c/m 2/11/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 32 | ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file Status Report. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/26/2019. (c/m 4/26/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 33 | ORDER Directing Plaintiff to inform the Court.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/30/2019. (c/m 5/30/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 34 | ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/21/2019. (c/m 6/24/2019 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |