Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5634116) filed by LERONE A. MARTIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Samahon, Tuan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/12/2018) |
2018-08-14 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 08/14/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-23 | 3 | NOTICE OF ERRATA by LERONE A. MARTIN re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CORRECTED COMPLAINT)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 08/23/2018) |
2018-09-17 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 09/17/2018) |
2018-09-18 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/6/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 09/18/2018) |
2018-09-18 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/06/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 09/18/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/09/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-23 | 9 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Tuan N. Samahon (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 10/23/2018) |
2018-10-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2018) |
2018-10-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/24/2018) |
2018-10-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/24/2018) |
2018-12-21 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2018) |
2018-12-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further status report on or before March 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/24/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/24/2018) |
2018-12-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/29/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 12/26/2018) |
2019-03-29 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-04-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before April 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/01/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/30/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before May 30, 2019. The parties are directed to propose in the status report a summary judgment briefing schedule, to commence no later than June 29, 2019, if any issues remain to be litigated. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/30/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/30/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-13 | 14 | MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by LERONE A. MARTIN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Supplemental Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 - FOIA request, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 - DOJ-FBI acknowledgment)(Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-14 | | MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff's Counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7(m), to provide notice to the Court regarding Defendant's position on Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/14/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 15 | NOTICE to Court Concerning Defendant DOJ's Position by LERONE A. MARTIN re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 16 | Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-25 | 17 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by LERONE A. MARTIN. (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 05/25/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 19 | ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/13/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-19 | 20 | SUPPLEMENTAL Complaint to re 1 Complaint, filed by LERONE A. MARTIN. (ztd) (Main Document 20 replaced on 7/1/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 06/25/2019) |
2019-06-27 | 21 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report and in light of the docketing of the Plaintiff's 20 Supplemental Complaint and the Defendant's 21 Answer, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report, to include a proposed briefing schedule, on or before July 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/27/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 22 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file a joint status report, to include a proposed briefing schedule, on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/01/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before September 12, 2019 and every sixty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/15/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-07-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 07/16/2019) |
2019-09-12 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-09-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 24 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 11, 2019. The next status report should include, with respect to the second request, an estimate of the number of responsive documents that will require processing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/13/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/13/2019) |
2019-09-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/11/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-11-12 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are now required to submit a Joint Status Report every 90 days. The next Report shall be due Wednesday, February 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/14/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-11-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2020-02-12 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2020) |
2020-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 26 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before May 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/14/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/14/2020) |
2020-02-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/12/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 02/14/2020) |
2020-05-12 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/12/2020) |
2020-05-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 27 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before August 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/12/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/12/2020) |
2020-05-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 05/13/2020) |
2020-08-03 | 28 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Brian J. Field (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-08-10 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by LERONE A. MARTIN. (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 29 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before November 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/11/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/11/2020) |
2020-08-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 08/11/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by LERONE A. MARTIN. (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-11-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 30 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before February 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/11/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/11/2020) |
2021-02-08 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT due by February 9, 2021 by LERONE A. MARTIN. (Samahon, Tuan) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-02-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 31 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before April 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/12/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/12/2021) |
2021-02-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 02/16/2021) |
2021-04-08 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 04/08/2021) |
2021-04-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 32 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file their next Joint Status Report on or before June 8, 2021. The Joint Status Report due June 8, 2021 shall indicate whether disputes remain and, if so, propose a schedule for summary judgment briefing. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/13/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/13/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 33 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 33 Proposed Briefing Schedule, the Court hereby sets the following deadlines. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due August 13, 2021. Plaintiff's combined response and cross-motion for summary judgment is due September 13, 2021. Defendant's combined reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion is due October 13, 2021. Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion is due October 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/09/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/09/2021) |
2021-08-02 | 34 | Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Briefing Schedule , Unopposed MOTION to Stay case by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 08/02/2021) |
2021-08-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule and Stay Case. The briefing schedule set on June 9, 2021, is hereby vacated. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report, including a schedule for processing the recently located documents, on or before August 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/04/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/04/2021) |
2021-08-13 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 08/13/2021) |
2021-08-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 35 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file their next Joint Status Report on or before September 21, 2021. The Joint Status Report due September 21, 2021 shall indicate whether disputes remain and, if so, propose a schedule for summary judgment briefing. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/16/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/16/2021) |
2021-08-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2021 (lsj) (Entered: 08/16/2021) |
2021-09-20 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/20/2021) |
2021-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 36 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before October 21, 2021, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by that date. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/22/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/22/2021) |
2021-10-21 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/21/2021) |
2021-10-27 | 38 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
2021-10-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 38 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/27/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |