Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief Under The Freedom of Information Act against United States Secret Service (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12592004.). Filed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/14/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2018) |
2018-08-14 | 2 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018) (Entered: 08/14/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 3 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 4 | Summons Issued as to United States Secret Service. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-28 | 5 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quentin L. Kopp.. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/28/2018) (Entered: 08/28/2018) |
2018-08-29 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quentin L. Kopp. United States Secret Service served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018) |
2018-08-29 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018) |
2018-09-24 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A Hunt (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018) |
2018-09-24 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Secret Service. (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018) |
2018-09-25 | 10 | CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 11 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Secret Service.. (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-30 | 12 | ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018) |
2018-10-31 | 13 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018) |
2018-10-31 | 14 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018) |
2018-10-31 | 15 | REQUEST for ADR Phone Conference (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018) |
2018-11-01 | 16 | ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, November 13, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (Entered: 11/01/2018) |
2018-11-09 | 17 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018) |
2018-11-13 | 18 | ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference set for 11/13/2018, HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED to 11/14/2018, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/13/2018) |
2018-11-14 | 19 | CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference, previously set for 11/16/18 at 2:00 PM, has been re-set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Any party seeking a continuance shall e-file a stipulation and proposed order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018) |
2018-11-14 | 20 | ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 11/14/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/14/2018) |
2019-01-07 | 21 | MOTION to Stay re 19 Clerk's Notice,, (Unopposed) filed by United States Secret Service. Responses due by 1/22/2019. Replies due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019) |
2019-01-08 | 22 | ORDER, signed as modified on 1/8/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part 21 Motion to Stay Deadlines for the Case Management Statement and Case Management Conference in Light of the Lapse of Appropriations. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019) (Entered: 01/08/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 23 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 2/15/2019) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-19 | 24 | CLERK'S NOTICE. Ms. Hunt may appear by phone on 2/22/19 at 2:00 PM for the Initial Case Management Conference. Ms. Hunt shall make arrangements through CourtCall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019) |
2019-02-25 | 25 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/22/2019. The person in charge for the Defendant shall appear at the further case management conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Parties may appear by phone and shall make arrangements through CourtCall FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Mallory Barr Attorney for Defendant: Linda Hunt (CourtCall) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2019) (Entered: 02/25/2019) |
2019-03-01 | 26 | NOTICE by United States Secret Service (Joint Statement of Contested Issues and Revised Proposed Briefing Schedule) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 3/1/2019) (Entered: 03/01/2019) |
2019-03-04 | 27 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/1/2019.Court adopted the schedule in the Joint Statement of Contested Issues and Revised Briefing Schedule [ECF 26]. Parties should meet and confer to see if they are able to resolve the attorney fee issue before filing formal motion. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Mallory Barr Attorney for Defendant: Linda Hunt (CourtCall) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2019) (Entered: 03/04/2019) |
2019-03-04 | 28 | ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ATTORNEY FEE MOTION. Responses due by 4/12/2019. Replies due by 4/26/2019. Motion For Attorneys's Fees and Costs due by 3/22/2019.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/4/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019) (Entered: 03/04/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 29 | MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Quentin L. Kopp. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2019 09:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 4/12/2019. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mallory A. Barr, # 2 Declaration of Quentin L. Kopp, # 3 Proposed Order)(Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-04 | | Electronic filing error . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Quentin L. Kopp Motion hearing is set for 9:30 PM. Clerk will issue notice to correct hearing time.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 30 | CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING TIME. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. There is no change in the briefing schedule as this corrects a filing error as to time. (Related documents(s) 29 )(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-12 | 31 | OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byUnited States Secret Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin L. Tyrrell, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 32 | REPLY (re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byQuentin L. Kopp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mallory Barr)(Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 33 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date to May 31, 2019) filed by United States Secret Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 34 | Order, signed 4/29/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 33 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion for Fees. Motion continued to 5/31/19 at 9:30 AM.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing re-set for 5/31/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 35 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2019 re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Quentin L. Kopp. Motion Submitted. FTR Time: 10:00-10:24. Attorney for Plaintiff: Mallory Barr Attorney for Defendant: Linda Hunt, Marcia Berman (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 36 | Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 37 | TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/31/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Quentin L. Kopp, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 38 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Quentin L. Kopp against United States Secret Service (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |