Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5641167) filed by ADAM S LOVINGER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 08/16/2018) |
2018-08-16 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of ADAM S. LOVINGER (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/21/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-28 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/27/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/27/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 10, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/26/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-27 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2018, at 11:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/27/2018) |
2018-10-10 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2018. On or before 11/9/2018, Defendant shall provide a draft search declaration and a draft Vaughn Index, as well as complete the process of re-reviewing the 75 pages of documents and release any responsive, non-exempt documents. Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/10/2018) |
2018-11-30 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/30/2018) |
2018-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/30/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/30/2018) |
2018-12-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (kt) (Entered: 12/03/2018) |
2018-12-19 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADAM S. LOVINGER. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018) |
2018-12-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 9, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 5, 2019, indicating whether any further issues remain in this matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018) |
2018-12-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/5/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/26/2018) |
2019-02-05 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-03-19 | 11 | STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/19/2019) |
2019-03-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant's stipulation of dismissal, Dkt. 11, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/19/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |