Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT, 5 U.S.C. § 552 et seq. against United States Patent and Trademark Office ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6899892.), filed by Snyders Heart Valve LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 [FOIA Letter], # 3 Exhibit 2 [Fee Estimate Commercial], # 4 Exhibit 3 [10- day extension _F-18-0001831], # 5 Exhibit 4 [2018 07 12 Freedom of Information Appeal Letter])(Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | | Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | | In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | 2 | Summons Issued as to United States Patent and Trademark Office, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) United States Attorney General, # 2 Summons(es) United States Attorney Eastern District of Texas)(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-10-05 | 3 | ***WITHDRAWN PER 7 . PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Request by Snyders Heart Valve LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Ryan Pinckney, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Service on PTO, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Service on U S Attorney, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Service on Attorney General, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pinckney, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2018 (rpc, ). (Entered: 10/05/2018) |
2018-10-05 | 4 | CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Snyders Heart Valve LLC (Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 5 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by United States Patent and Trademark Office.(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | | In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 6 | Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 3 Request for Entry of Default by Clerk, Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Request for Entry of Default by Clerk by Snyders Heart Valve LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 7 | ORDER granting 6 Motion to Withdraw Clerk's Entry of Default of United States Patent and Trademark Office (Dkt. 3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/9/2018. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2019-04-15 | 8 | ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/14/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/15/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 9 | Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss by Snyders Heart Valve LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pinckney, Christopher) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 10 | ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this entire action, and all of the claims asserted therein, be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 04/29/2019. (las, ) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |