Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5642594) filed by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Lawton, William) (Entered: 08/16/2018) |
2018-08-16 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-23 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/23/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 3 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-27 | 4 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/27/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/27/2018) |
2018-09-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/27/2018) |
2018-10-11 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/11/2018) |
2018-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than November 20, 2018, updating the court on Defendant's efforts to produce responsive materials. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/12/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/12/2018) |
2018-10-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/15/2018) |
2018-11-19 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/19/2018) |
2018-11-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit another Report no later than January 20, 2019, which updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/20/2018) |
2018-11-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 11/21/2018) |
2019-01-18 | 7 | MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-22 | | Minute Order granting Defendant's 7 Motion for Stay and Extension of Time. This matter is hereby stayed. Within seven business days of Department of Justice operations resuming, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report that proposes a schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/22/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/22/2019) |
2019-02-04 | 8 | NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report no later than March 5, 2019, that updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts. If needed, the parties shall propose a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/04/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-04 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (jf) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-02-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report regarding Defendant's production of responsive information no later than March 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/05/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-02-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-03-05 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/05/2019) |
2019-03-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than April 5, 2019, updating the court on Defendant's production efforts and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/06/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/10/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 10, 2019, which updates the court on search and production efforts and estimates a time for completing production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/08/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Lawton, William) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 20, 2019, which sets forth the status of production and recommends a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/10/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-13 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 12 Status Report; emailed to nlawton@meyerglitz.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. DO NOT REFILE - For future filings electronic signature required (zjf, ) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 24, 2019, that proposes further proceedings for this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/21/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 06/25/2019) |
2019-07-23 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/24/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-08-16 | 15 | NOTICE of Change of Address by William N. Lawton (Lawton, William) (Entered: 08/16/2019) |
2019-08-20 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/20/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/22/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-09-24 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-09-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 24, 2019, which proposes a schedule for further proceedings in this matter, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/25/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-09-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/24/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 09/25/2019) |
2019-10-24 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Lawton, William) (Entered: 10/24/2019) |
2019-10-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 25, 2019, which proposes a schedule for further proceedings in this matter, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/25/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 19 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Lawton, William) Modified on 11/25/2019 (zjf). (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Lawton, William) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 19 Status Report was entered in error at the request of counsel and refiled. (jf) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 17, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/25/19. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2020-01-16 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/16/2020) |
2020-01-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 5, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/16/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/16/2020) |
2020-01-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-02-28 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/28/2020) |
2020-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 8, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/28/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/28/2020) |
2020-02-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-04-08 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/08/2020) |
2020-04-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 8, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/09/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
2020-04-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
2020-05-28 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/28/2020) |
2020-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 8, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/29/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/29/2020) |
2020-05-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 06/01/2020) |
2020-07-08 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/08/2020) |
2020-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 8, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/08/2020) |
2020-07-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/8/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 07/09/2020) |
2020-08-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties were to have filed a Joint Status Report on August 8, 2020, but failed to do so. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/10/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-08-10 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Lawton, William) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-08-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 08/11/2020) |
2020-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 11, 2020, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/11/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/11/2020) |
2020-08-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 08/12/2020) |
2020-09-04 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/04/2020) |
2020-09-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 22, 2020, which updates the court on settlement, unless on or before that date they file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/08/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/08/2020) |
2020-09-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 09/09/2020) |
2020-09-22 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Lawton, William) (Entered: 09/22/2020) |
2020-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 23, 2020, regarding the status of settlement, unless before that date they file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/22/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/22/2020) |
2020-09-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-10-09 | 29 | NOTICE Joint Notice of Settlement Agreement by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Lawton, William) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-11-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Per the parties' 29 Joint Notice of Settlement Agreement filed on October 9, 2020, the parties indicated that they had reached a settlement and that they "anticipate[d] filing a stipulation of dismissal within the next thirty days." The parties have yet to file a stipulation of dismissal. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by November 17, 2020, concerning the status of settlement, unless they file a stipulation of dismissal before that date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/10/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/10/2020) |
2020-11-10 | 30 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/10/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |