Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5646611) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2018) |
2018-08-17 | 2 | LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2018) |
2018-08-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-20 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-20 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/20/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-31 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/27/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/23/2018. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2018) |
2018-09-24 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mark Norway on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018) |
2018-09-24 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 11)(Norway, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018) |
2018-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 25, 2018, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/1/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018) |
2018-10-01 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2018, at 10:45 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 10/01/2018) |
2018-10-25 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/25/2018. Joint Status Report due on or before 11/30/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/25/2018) |
2018-11-30 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2018) |
2018-11-30 | 9 | Amended STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2018) |
2018-12-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/02/2018) |
2018-12-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/03/2018) |
2019-01-11 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Due to Lapse in Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norway, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the government's unopposed motion to stay 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be STAYED until Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status within thirty (30) days of Congress appropriating such funding. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/13/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/13/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 11 | NOTICE to the Court of Restoration of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the government's notice 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is UNSTAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-01-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2019. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-02-21 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this case: (1) the Department of State shall make its first production on or before March 5, 2019, and continue making monthly productions on the 5th (or, if the 5th falls on a holiday, on the next business day); (2) the Department of State shall conclude its productions on or before July 5, 2019; and (3) the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 19, 2019, to propose a schedule for further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/21/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-02-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of State conclusion of productions due by 7/5/2019; Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/22/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 13 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Final Production by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | MINUTE Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The production deadline shall be extended to September 5, 2019. It is furthered that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/2/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Production deadline extended to 9/5/2019; Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019. (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-09-03 | 14 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Final Production Deadline by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2019) |
2019-09-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants second unopposed motion to extend the final production deadline 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall complete production of records to Plaintiffs on or before September 26, 2019. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/04/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-09-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall complete production of records to Plaintiffs on or before 9/26/2019; Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019. (kt) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-10-10 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2019) |
2019-10-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/11/19. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 10/11/2019) |
2019-10-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2019. (kt) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-11-07 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before December 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/12/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-12-09 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2019) |
2019-12-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/10/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2019-12-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2020. (dot) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2020-01-15 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Norway, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall conclude its productions in this case on or before April 8, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 22, 2020 proposing a schedule for future proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/17/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-03-26 | 19 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Existing Deadlines in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic's Effect on Federal Government Operations by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 March 26, 2020 Declaration of E. Stein, # 2 Proposed Order)(Norway, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-04-14 | 20 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph John DeMott on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Robert M. Norway (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-05-22 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-06-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the unopposed motion to stay 19 and the parties' joint status report 21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is STAYED in light of the COVID-19 pandemic's impact on the Department of State's ability to process records in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. The parties shall file a further joint status report on June 26, 2020, updating the Court on Defendant's ability to produce records in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/9/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020) |
2020-06-26 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-07-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/17/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020) |
2020-07-27 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2020) |
2020-07-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/28/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020) |
2020-08-14 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 08/14/2020) |
2020-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 24 , it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 9, 2020; (2) the production schedule previously set in this Court's minute order of January 17, 2020 is VACATED; and (3) Defendant shall complete its next production of documents to Plaintiffs on or before October 1, 2020, with subsequent productions to occur on the first workday of each following month as necessary. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/14/2020. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/14/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-11-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 25 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/10/2020. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 11/10/2020) |
2020-12-15 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 26 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/17/2020. (lrdm3) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2021-02-01 | 27 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2021) |
2021-02-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Production Deadline, Dkt. 27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant's next production is extended to February 5, 2021. All other deadlines in this matter remain unaltered. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/2/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-02-17 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2021) |
2021-02-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 02/17/2021) |
2021-03-15 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 03/15/2021) |
2021-03-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 29 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 03/15/2021) |
2021-04-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon the Court's own motion, and in light of the fact that, "[o]n March 1, 2021, the State Department made its final production of records in this case," Dkt. 29 at 1, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is UNSTAYED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/9/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 04/09/2021) |
2021-05-14 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 05/14/2021) |
2021-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 30 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report or stipulation of dismissal on or before June 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/17/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 05/17/2021) |
2021-06-15 | 31 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/15/2021) |
2021-06-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, Dkt. 31 , it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/17/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 06/17/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |