Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-11-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5812003) filed by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-11-29 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-12-07 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/6/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/7/2018) (zjf). (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2018-12-07 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 12/6/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/12/2018) (zjf). (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2018-12-07 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/12/2018) (zjf). (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2018-12-26 | 7 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) Modified on 12/26/2018 (jth). (Entered: 12/26/2018) |
2018-12-26 | 8 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer CORRECTED MOTION TO ENLARGE by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/26/2018) |
2018-12-26 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 7 was entered in error and was refiled by counsel s Docket Entry 8 . (jth) (Entered: 12/26/2018) |
2018-12-27 | 9 | RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer CORRECTED MOTION TO ENLARGE (a non-opposition response) filed by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 12/27/2018) |
2018-12-28 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and propose a revised schedule for the filing of a responsive pleading, if necessary, at that time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/28/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/28/2018) |
2019-02-05 | 10 | NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (McBride, Patricia) . (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-02-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's notice 10 , the Court's December 28, 2018 minute order granting a stay of this case is hereby lifted. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/5/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 12 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before April 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/12/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit another status report by May 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/09/2019) |
2019-05-16 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit another status report by June 20, 2019, if the case has not been dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/17/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-06-20 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit another status report by July 22, 2019, if the case has not been dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/24/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-22 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by COLORADO WILD PUBLIC LANDS. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/22/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |