Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5875413) filed by INTELIMAP, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2019) |
2019-01-08 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTELIMAP, INC. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2019) |
2019-01-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019) |
2019-01-09 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019) |
2019-01-17 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 01/17/2019) |
2019-02-07 | 5 | Joint MOTION to Stay Case by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2019) |
2019-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Motion to Stay Case, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to the parties' request for an extension of time for the defendant to file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 14, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 5/10/2019, (hs) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 6 | GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Because the plaintiff pursues this action under the Freedom of Information Act, the initial disclosure requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A) are not implicated and no scheduling conference need be held. See Local Civ. R. 16.3(b)(10). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit to the Court on or before June 28, 2019, a joint status report, proposing a schedule for the filing of, if any, dispositive motions, oppositions thereto, and replies. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 16, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by INTELIMAP, INC.. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the parties' efforts to resolve any remaining disputes and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule to resolve such disputes. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 1, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-23 | 9 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by INTELIMAP, INC.. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 Stipulation of Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 29, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/29/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |