Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5884974) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BLM Summons, # 3 Summons DOI summons, # 4 Summons US Atty summons, # 5 Summons AG summons)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-11 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emma A. O. Bruden, :Firm- Kampmeier & Knutsen,, :Address- P.O. Box 15099 Portland, Oregon 97293. Phone No. - (503) 719-5641. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5885034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-11 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-16 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019) |
2019-01-16 | 4 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019) |
2019-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma A. O. Bruden. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/17/2019) |
2019-02-05 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-02-21 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-02-22 | | ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by March 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/22/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/22/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2019. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/23/2019. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 1/28/2019 (Bruden, Emma) Modified to correct date served on 2/28/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 1/28/2019 (Bruden, Emma) Modified to correct date served on 2/28/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 11 | Joint MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines , Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Establishing a Production Schedule by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 12 | ERRATA to [Proposed] Order by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Establishing a Production Schedule filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 13 | ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay; granting 11 Motion for Scheduling Order. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's review of at least 1,500 pages of FOIA request by 4/15/2019. Status Report due by 5/20/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-05-20 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 05/20/2019) |
2019-07-19 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 07/19/2019) |
2019-09-17 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2020-01-14 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-03-13 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2020) |
2020-05-12 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/12/2020) |
2020-07-10 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2020) |
2020-09-08 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2020) |
2020-11-06 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2020) |
2021-01-05 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Bruden, Emma) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-03-05 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2021) |
2021-05-02 | 26 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Paul Cirino (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/02/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-07-02 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/02/2021) |
2021-08-31 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/31/2021) |
2021-10-29 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/29/2021) |
2021-12-28 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/28/2021) |
2022-02-25 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/25/2022) |
2022-04-26 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/26/2022) |
2022-06-24 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/24/2022) |
2022-08-23 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/23/2022) |
2022-10-20 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-12-19 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
2023-02-17 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-04-11 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 39 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by June 9, 2023, unless this case is dismissed before that date. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/12/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-06-09 | 40 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/09/2023) |
2023-06-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 40 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by August 8, 2023, unless this case is dismissed before that date. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/9/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/09/2023) |
2023-08-08 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 42 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by November 20, 2023, unless this case is dismissed before that date. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/12/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 43 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by January 19, 2024, unless this case is dismissed before that date. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/21/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2024-01-09 | 44 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/09/2024) |
2024-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 44 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/9/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/09/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |