Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5896188) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-18 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-18 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-29 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/28/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/29/2019) |
2019-02-26 | 5 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/26/2019) |
2019-02-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/26/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/26/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 7 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before April 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/22/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-15 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a status report on June 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/15/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another joint status report by July 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/4/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/23/2019. (tg) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 24, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 07/29/2019) |
2019-09-10 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2019) |
2019-09-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 11, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/24/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-10-23 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before December 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 31, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/31/2019) |
2019-10-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-12-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2019-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before January 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 12, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/12/2019) |
2019-12-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2020-01-28 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/28/2020) |
2020-02-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 3, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-02-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2020. (zcdw) Modified filing date on 2/21/2020 (zcdw). (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-03-11 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/11/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |