Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-31 | 1 | COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5919726) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons CFPB, # 14 Summons DOD, # 15 Summons USAO, # 16 Summons USAG)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-01-31 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-01-31 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-03-06 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/4/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 3/4/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-06 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to nshah@democracyforward.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The tracking notice should have been attached to this entry. Please file the confirmations using the event Notice, Notice(Other). (ztd, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/19/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/10/2019) |
2019-04-19 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-04-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report by May 21, 2019, in which they address the status of any outstanding searches and a schedule for completing the production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/25/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/21/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-05-21 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-06-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report by June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/13/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report by July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/25/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/25/2019) |
2019-06-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 06/26/2019) |
2019-07-22 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 07/22/2019) |
2019-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further status report by September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/23/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/23/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-09-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/23/2019) |
2019-09-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further status report by October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/23/19. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/23/2019) |
2019-09-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-10-23 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further status report proposing a summary judgment briefing schedule, if necessary, by December 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/19. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/23/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-12-23 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 12/23/2019) |
2019-12-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further status report proposing a summary judgment briefing schedule, if necessary, by January 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/24/19. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/24/2019) |
2019-12-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 12/26/2019) |
2020-01-23 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-01-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 joint status report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further status report on February 24, 2020. If the parties are unable to resolve any remaining disputes by that date, the following briefing schedule shall apply: Defendants' Vaughn Index is due on March 9, 2020; Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on March 30, 2020; Plaintiff's cross-motion and opposition is due on April 20, 2020; Defendants' combined opposition and reply is due on May 11, 2020; and Plaintiff's reply is due on May 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/27/2020. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/27/2020) |
2020-01-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 3/9/2020. Status Report due by 2/24/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 3/30/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/20/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/26/2020. (lsj) (Entered: 01/27/2020) |
2020-02-13 | 14 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 stipulation of dismissal, the case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/13/2020. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |