Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5942246) filed by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hannah Swanson, :Firm- Planned Parenthood Federation of America, :Address- hannah.swanson@ppfa.org. Phone No. - 202-973-4800. Fax No. - 202-296-3480 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5942452. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Muniz, Richard) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/13/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Hannah Swanson may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 12, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-14 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Swanson on behalf of PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Swanson, Hannah) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 6 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Muniz, Richard) Modified on 2/20/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-20 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to richard.muniz@ppfa.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect dates of service; Refile with proof of delivery; Delivery date is correct date of service. (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019) |
2019-02-21 | 7 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Muniz, Richard); Modified on 2/27/2019 (tth). (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-02-25 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/25/2019) |
2019-02-27 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, was entered in error at the request of counsel. Said pleading was refiled as Docket Entry 8 . (tth) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-26 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 26, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-04-11 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 11, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/14/2019) |
2019-05-17 | 12 | Second STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-21 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 21, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 13 | Third STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 1, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 30, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 14 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Fourth Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Fourth Joint Status Report)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Fourth Joint Status Report. The parties shall file the next joint status report on or before November 14, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 1, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-13 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT Fourth Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2019) |
2019-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 19, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 14, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-12-19 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT Fifth Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2019-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 30, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 19, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2020-01-30 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT Sixth Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-02-03 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 17 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 28, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 3, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-02-27 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT Seventh Joint Status Report by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 18 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 27, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 3, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/03/2020) |
2020-03-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 03/03/2020) |
2020-03-05 | 19 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-27 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT Eighth Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/27/2020) |
2020-04-01 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 20 Eighth Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 5, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 1, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 21 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-05-27 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in light of the parties' 21 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court shall close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 27, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/27/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |