Case Description | The Center for Biological Diversity submitted two FOIA requests to the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning the Sunshine Project ethane cracker in Formosa, St. James Parish, Louisiana. In response to the Center's first request, the Corps told the Center that all the records were disclosable, but although the Corps disclosed some records it did not disclose all the responsive records. The Center filed an administrative appeal of that request. The Corps did not respond to the Center's second request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, the Center filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees
|
Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5942342) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Crystal, Howard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/13/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren Packard, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway, Suite 800, Oakland, California 94612. Phone No. - 510-844-7103. Fax No. - 510-844-7150 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5942728. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lauren Packard)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | | Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 5 | GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/15/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-03-05 | 6 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 03/05/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |
|