Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5950854) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons USA)(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 2/15/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | | Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-26 | 4 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Dep't of Homeland Security, # 2 Summons Department of Defense)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/26/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 5 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (ztd) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-03-18 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/25/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/25/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2019.) (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 7 | ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Cartier, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 5/3/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/4/19. (DJS) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-05-03 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by 6/14/19, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/15/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-06-14 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cartier, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-06-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by 7/31/19, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/17/19. (DJS) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2019. (tb) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 10 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due September 16, 2019. Plaintiff's Combined Cross-Motion /Opposition due October 11, 2019. Defendants' Reply/Opposition due November 1, 2019. Plaintiff's Reply due November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/22/19. (DJS) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due 9/16/2019; Plaintiff's Combined Cross-Motion /Opposition due 10/11/2019; Defendants' Reply/Opposition due 11/1/2019; Plaintiff's Reply due 11/22/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 11 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-27 | 12 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/27/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |