Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995258) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Interior, # 3 Summons Fish and Wildlife Service, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/15/2019; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 3/15/2019 (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/18/2019. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/19/2019. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-12 | 7 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. In order to permit defense counsel additional time to confer with agency counsel and prepare a response, and without any objection expressed by Plaintiff, the Court GRANTS' Defendants' 7 Motion, for good cause shown. The deadline for Defendants' answer or other response to the 1 Complaint shall be extended until MAY 10, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 15, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/10/2019. (dot) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 9 | ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than JUNE 14, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 15, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-06-14 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-06-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendants' processing and production of Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act requests are in progress. The Court shall adopt the parties' proposal that they file a further Joint Status Report by JULY 16, 2019 . That report shall update the Court as to the status of Defendants' processing, production, and estimated timeline for issuance of draft Vaughn indices. The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report every thirty days thereafter, unless and until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 14, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-06-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2019. (dot) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 07/16/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, and consistent with the Court's June 14, 2019 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 15, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Additional Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/16/2019) |
2019-09-10 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Amy R. Atwood on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 09/10/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 16, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019 (mac) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 19, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-11-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2019. (mac) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-12-16 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/16/2019) |
2019-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 17, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/17/2019) |
2019-12-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/17/2019) |
2020-01-23 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by February 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 23, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-01-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/26/2020) |
2020-02-24 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-02-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 24, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-02-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 26, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-04-24 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 04/24/2020) |
2020-04-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-04-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-05-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by June 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/27/2020) |
2020-06-25 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/25/2020) |
2020-06-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 29, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/29/2020) |
2020-06-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 06/30/2020) |
2020-07-27 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/27/2020) |
2020-07-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 24 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 28, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/28/2020) |
2020-07-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/28/2020) |
2020-08-26 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 08/26/2020) |
2020-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 29, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/29/2020) |
2020-08-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 08/31/2020) |
2020-09-25 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 09/25/2020) |
2020-09-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by October 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 25, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/25/2020) |
2020-09-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 09/25/2020) |
2020-10-26 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/26/2020) |
2020-10-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by November 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 28, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/28/2020) |
2020-10-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/29/2020) |
2020-11-25 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 11/25/2020) |
2020-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by December 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 30, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-12-16 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 12/16/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 29 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 17, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2021-01-27 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/27/2021) |
2021-01-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 30 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 28, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/28/2021) |
2021-01-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 01/28/2021) |
2021-03-01 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/01/2021) |
2021-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 31 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 8, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/08/2021) |
2021-03-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 03/08/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-05-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 32 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by June 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 3, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/03/2021) |
2021-05-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-06-10 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-06-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 33 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/15/2021) |
2021-06-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 06/16/2021) |
2021-07-29 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 07/29/2021) |
2021-08-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 34 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 5, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/05/2021) |
2021-08-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 08/06/2021) |
2021-09-29 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/29/2021) |
2021-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. After review of the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests on or before October 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 30, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/30/2021) |
2021-09-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-10-27 | 36 | STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |