Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995533) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Customs and Border Protection, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Scott, Jeramie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/12/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2019. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/25/2019. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/25/2019 (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-04-26 | | MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 26, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 13, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2019. (kh) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-06-10 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2019) |
2019-06-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 11, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/11/2019) |
2019-06-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-07-10 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2019) |
2019-07-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 11, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/11/2019) |
2019-07-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2019. (kh) (Entered: 07/11/2019) |
2019-08-12 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 20, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 13, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jay Butler on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Butler, Alan) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/6/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-05 | 14 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeramie D. Scott (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 09/05/2019) |
2019-09-19 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 09/19/2019) |
2019-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 5, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 20, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/20/2019) |
2019-09-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/23/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 17 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Cuong Truong on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Matthew Kahn (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 20, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 6, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2019-12-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 7, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 20, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2020-02-07 | 19 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 02/07/2020) |
2020-02-07 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 02/07/2020) |
2020-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 8, 2020, if the parties have not yet reached a settlement by that time. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 7, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/07/2020) |
2020-03-09 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/09/2020) |
2020-03-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 8, 2020, if the parties have not yet reached a settlement by that time. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 10, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-04-08 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/08/2020) |
2020-04-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/22/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
2020-04-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 22, 2020, if the parties have not yet reached a settlement by that time. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 8, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
2020-04-22 | 23 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 04/22/2020) |
2020-04-22 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in light of the parties' 23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 22, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/22/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |