Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995610) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Dept of the Interior)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-13 | 3 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/13/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-04-10 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/18/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/18/2019 (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/10/2019) |
2019-04-11 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on May 14, 2019, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/12/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-12 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) Modified on 4/15/2019 to correct hearing type (kt). (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-05-14 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-06-19 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019) |
2019-06-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before July 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/20/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2019. (kt) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/31/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019. (kt) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-09-09 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/12/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-09-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019. (kt) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-10-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/2/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2019. (kt) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-11-07 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/07/2019) |
2019-11-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 10 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before January 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/12/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2020-01-08 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 01/08/2020) |
2020-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/10/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-03-05 | 12 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR Substituting for attorney W. Mark Nebeker (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-06 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/06/2020) |
2020-03-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/12/20. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |