Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5996951) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration corporate disclosure, # 3 Summons Navy Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/13/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-13 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-03-13 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-03-13 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 6 | VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 8 ENTERED ON 5/20/2019.....ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index and supporting dispositive motion within thirty days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/18/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 5/21/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index and supporting Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-05-03 | 7 | MOTION to Vacate Dispositive Motion Deadline by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-21 | 8 | ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate. The government shall respond to plaintiff's FOIA request and the parties shall file a joint status report every 45 days until production is complete. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/20/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-07-05 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2019) |
2019-08-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further joint status report no later than 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/06/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further joint status report no later than 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/16/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/16/2019) |
2019-08-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 08/16/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-10-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report no later than 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/28/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-11-14 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-11-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report no later than 01/15/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/26/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2020-01-15 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 02/18/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/17/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 03/19/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/03/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/03/2020) |
2020-03-19 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/19/2020) |
2020-03-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Joint Status Report due no later than 4/9/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/19/2020. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 03/19/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-04-09 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |